This case was last updated from Sacramento County Superior Courts on 01/11/2023 at 01:48:06 (UTC).

U.S. Bank National Association vs. Allyssa Bruggman

Case Summary

On 10/17/2022 U S Bank National Association filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against Allyssa Bruggman. This case was filed in Sacramento County Superior Courts, Gordon D Schaber Sacramento County Courthouse located in Sacramento, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********8487

  • Filing Date:

    10/17/2022

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Sacramento, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

U.S. Bank National Association

Defendants

Bruggman, Allyssa

Does 1-10

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Janet L Brown

Defendant Attorney

Rachel Renno

 

Court Documents

Complaint filed

Complaint filed

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed

Summons filed

Summons filed

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed

Answer filed

Answer filed

 

Docket Entries

11/23/2022
View Court Documents

DocketROA Entry: Answer filed; Filed By: Bruggman, Allyssa(Defendant)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/07/2022
View Court Documents

DocketROA Entry: Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed; Filed By: U.S. Bank National Association(Plaintiff)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/18/2022
View Court Documents

DocketROA Entry: Summons filed; Filed By: U.S. Bank National Association(Plaintiff)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/18/2022

DocketROA Entry: Summons for 30-Day Summons was issued during case initiation on 10/18/2022

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/17/2022
View Court Documents

DocketROA Entry: Civil Case Cover Sheet filed; Filed By: U.S. Bank National Association(Plaintiff)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/17/2022
View Court Documents

DocketROA Entry: Complaint filed; Filed By: U.S. Bank National Association(Plaintiff)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less