This case was last updated from Not Yet Classified on 07/18/2023 at 08:03:18 (UTC).

Turton Commercial Real Estate., a California Corporation vs. Robert W. Clippinger

Case Summary

On 03/07/2023 Turton Commercial Real Estate , a California Corporation filed a Not Yet Classified lawsuit against Robert W Clippinger. This case was filed in Not Yet Classified, Not Yet Classified. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-GDS

  • Filing Date:

    03/07/2023

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Not Yet Classified

  • Courthouse:

    Not Yet Classified

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Turton Commercial Real Estate., a California Corporation

Defendants

1300U SPE, LLC, a Delaware Limited Liability Company

Clippinger Investment Properties, Inc., a California Corporation

Robert W. Clippinger

 

Court Documents

Complaint

03/07/2023; Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet

03/07/2023; Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment and Case Management Conference

03/08/2023; Notice of Case Assignment and Case Management Conference

Summons

03/08/2023; Summons

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

04/12/2023; Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Answer

05/31/2023; Answer

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/31/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketName: Answer; Filed By: Robert W. Clippinger (Defendant); Clippinger Investment Properties, Inc., a California Corporation (Defendant); 1300U SPE, LLC, a Delaware Limited Liability Company (Defendant) et al.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/31/2023
  • DocketMessage: Answer Filed by: Robert W. Clippinger (Defendant); Clippinger Investment Properties, Inc., a California Corporation (Defendant); 1300U SPE, LLC, a Delaware Limited Liability Company (Defendant) et al.; Category: Document

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/12/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketName: Proof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed By: Turton Commercial Real Estate., a California Corporation (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/12/2023
  • DocketMessage: Proof of Service by Substituted Service Filed by: Turton Commercial Real Estate., a California Corporation (Plaintiff) As to: Robert W. Clippinger (Defendant) Proof of Mailing Date: 04/07/2023 Service Cost Waived: No; Category: Document

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/08/2023
  • HearingMessage: Case Management Conference - Case Management Program scheduled for 01/12/2024 at 08:30:00 AM in Department 38 at Gordon D Schaber Courthouse and the Notice of Case Management Conference and Order to Appear has been generated .; Category: Scheduling

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/08/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketName: Summons; Filed By: Turton Commercial Real Estate., a California Corporation (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/08/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketName: Notice of Case Assignment and Case Management Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/08/2023
  • DocketName: RECEIPT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/08/2023
  • DocketMessage: Summons for 30-Day Summons was issued during case initiation on 03/08/2023 .; Category: Case

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/08/2023
  • DocketMessage: Summons filed. Filed By: Turton Commercial Real Estate., a California Corporation (Plaintiff); Category: Document

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/07/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketName: Civil Case Cover Sheet; Filed By: Turton Commercial Real Estate., a California Corporation (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/07/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketName: Complaint; Filed By: Turton Commercial Real Estate., a California Corporation (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/07/2023
  • DocketMessage: Civil Case Cover Sheet filed. Filed By: Turton Commercial Real Estate., a California Corporation (Plaintiff); Category: Document

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/07/2023
  • DocketMessage: Complaint filed. Filed By: Turton Commercial Real Estate., a California Corporation (Plaintiff); Category: Document

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/07/2023
  • DocketMessage: Case assigned to Department 38 .; Category: Case

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less