This case was last updated from Sacramento County Superior Courts on 02/08/2021 at 23:32:08 (UTC).

Trevor Paul Stewart vs. Him Wo Jeffrey Tan

Case Summary

On 06/12/2020 Trevor Paul Stewart filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against Him Wo Jeffrey Tan. This case was filed in Sacramento County Superior Courts, Gordon D Schaber Sacramento County Courthouse located in Sacramento, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0673

  • Filing Date:

    06/12/2020

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Sacramento, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Stewart, Trevor Paul

Defendants

Tan, Him Wo Jeffrey

Lee, Mei Yee

DOES 1-50

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Scott Michael Good

Defendant Attorney

Sara K Batres

 

Court Documents

Case Management Conference - Case Management Program scheduled for 12/24/2020 at 08:30:00 AM in Department 43 at Gordon D Schaber Courthouse and the Notice of Case Management Conference and Order to Appear has been generated .

Case Management Conference - Case Management Program scheduled for 12/24/2020 at 08:30:00 AM in Department 43 at Gordon D Schaber Courthouse and the Notice of Case Management Conference and Order to Appear has been generated .

Summons filed.

Summons filed. (Filed By: Stewart, Trevor(Plaintiff))

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed.

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed. (Filed By: Stewart, Trevor(Plaintiff))

Complaint filed.

Complaint filed. (Filed By: Stewart, Trevor(Plaintiff))

Request for Dismissal filed.

Request for Dismissal filed. (Filed By: Stewart, Trevor(Plaintiff))

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed.

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed. (Filed By: Stewart, Trevor(Plaintiff))

Answer (To Complaint) filed.

Answer (To Complaint) filed. (Filed By: Tan, Him Wo(Defendant))

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed.

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed. (Filed By: Stewart, Trevor(Plaintiff))

Order - Other (re: Initial CMC) filed.

Order - Other (re: Initial CMC) filed.

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal filed. (Filed By: Stewart, Trevor(Plaintiff))

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/24/2020
  • DocketPast Hearings - Event Time: 8:30 AM; Event Type: Case Management Conference - Case Management Program; Department: 43; Status: Scheduled

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed. (Filed By: Stewart, Trevor(Plaintiff))

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAnswer (To Complaint) filed. (Filed By: Tan, Him Wo(Defendant))

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed. (Filed By: Stewart, Trevor(Plaintiff))

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder - Other (re: Initial CMC) filed.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons filed. (Filed By: Stewart, Trevor(Plaintiff))

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/15/2020
  • DocketSummons for 30-Day Summons was issued during case initiation on 06/15/2020 .

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Conference - Case Management Program scheduled for 12/24/2020 at 08:30:00 AM in Department 43 at Gordon D Schaber Courthouse and the Notice of Case Management Conference and Order to Appear has been generated .

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint filed. (Filed By: Stewart, Trevor(Plaintiff))

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed. (Filed By: Stewart, Trevor(Plaintiff))

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/12/2020
  • DocketCase assigned to Department 43 .

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less