This case was last updated from Sacramento County Superior Courts on 06/03/2022 at 11:43:33 (UTC).

Tommy Davis vs. Kaiser Foundation Health Plan, Inc.

Case Summary

On 03/24/2022 Tommy Davis filed a Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice lawsuit against Kaiser Foundation Health Plan, Inc. This case was filed in Sacramento County Superior Courts, Gordon D Schaber Sacramento County Courthouse located in Sacramento, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********7393

  • Filing Date:

    03/24/2022

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice

  • County, State:

    Sacramento, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Davis, Tommy

Defendants

Does 1-50

Kaiser Foundation Health Plan, Inc.

Kaiser Foundation Hospitals

The Permanente Medical Group, Inc

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Steven D Davis

Defendant Attorney

Mark A Muro

 

Court Documents

Complaint filed

Complaint filed

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed

Summons filed

Summons filed

Order - Other (Delay in Scheduling Initial Case Management Conference) filed

Order - Other (Delay in Scheduling Initial Case Management Conference) filed

Order - Other filed

Order - Other filed

Clerk's Certificate of Service By Mail (out of process) generated

Clerk's Certificate of Service By Mail (out of process) generated

Answer filed

Answer filed

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/02/2022
  • HearingEvent Type: Case Management Conference - Case Management Program; Department: 38; Status: Scheduled

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketROA Entry: Clerk's Certificate of Service By Mail (out of process) generated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2022
  • DocketROA Entry: Case Management Conference - Case Management Program scheduled for 09/02/2022 at 08:30:00 AM in Department 38 at Gordon D Schaber Courthouse and the Notice of Case Management Conference and Order to Appear has been generated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketROA Entry: Order - Other filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketROA Entry: Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed; Filed By: Davis, Tommy(Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2022
  • DocketROA Entry: Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed; Filed By: Davis, Tommy(Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketROA Entry: Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed; Filed By: Davis, Tommy(Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketROA Entry: Answer filed; Filed By: Kaiser Foundation Health Plan, Inc.(Defendant); Kaiser Foundation Hospitals(Defendant); The Permanente Medical Group, Inc(Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2022
  • DocketROA Entry: Summons for 30-Day Summons was issued during case initiation on 03/28/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketROA Entry: Summons filed; Filed By: Davis, Tommy(Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2022
  • DocketROA Entry: Case assigned to Department 38

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketROA Entry: Order - Other (Delay in Scheduling Initial Case Management Conference) filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketROA Entry: Civil Case Cover Sheet filed; Filed By: Davis, Tommy(Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketROA Entry: Complaint filed; Filed By: Davis, Tommy(Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where The Permanente Medical Group is a litigant

Latest cases where KAISER FOUNDATION HEALTH PLAN INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Mark A Muro