This case was last updated from Sacramento County Superior Courts on 09/08/2019 at 13:31:04 (UTC).

Timothy Hildebrand vs. Mike Ness

Case Summary

On 07/18/2019 Timothy Hildebrand filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against Mike Ness. This case was filed in Sacramento County Superior Courts, Gordon D Schaber Sacramento County Courthouse located in Sacramento, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0799

  • Filing Date:

    07/18/2019

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Sacramento, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Hildebrand, Timothy

Defendants

Relentless Artist Management Inc

Social Distortion

House of Blues Concerts Inc

Ness, Mike

Ace of Spades

Agency for the Performing Arts

Black Kat Kustoms

Ace of Spades Concerts LLC

Does 1-100

Crime Don't Pay Inc

Live Nation Entertainment Inc

Epitaph (A California Corp)

Live Nation Worldwide Inc

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

David P Mastagni

Defendant Attorneys

Ernest L Weiss

Joseph P Acosta

Christopher J Nevis

 

Court Documents

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute filed.

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute filed. (Filed By: Hildebrand, Timothy(Plaintiff))

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute filed.

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute filed. (Filed By: Ace of Spades(Defendant))

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed.

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed. (Filed By: Hildebrand, Timothy(Plaintiff))

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed.

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed. (Filed By: Hildebrand, Timothy(Plaintiff))

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed.

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed. (Filed By: Hildebrand, Timothy(Plaintiff))

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed.

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed. (Filed By: Hildebrand, Timothy(Plaintiff))

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute filed.

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute filed. (Filed By: Hildebrand, Timothy(Plaintiff))

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute filed.

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute filed. (Filed By: Hildebrand, Timothy(Plaintiff))

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed.

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed. (Filed By: Hildebrand, Timothy(Plaintiff))

Declaration - Other (pf Joseph P Acosta pursuant CCP 430.41(a)(2)) filed.

Declaration - Other (pf Joseph P Acosta pursuant CCP 430.41(a)(2)) filed. (Filed By: Agency for the Performing Arts(Defendant))

Demurrer filed.

Demurrer filed. (Filed By: Epitaph (A California Corp)(Defendant))

Motion to Strike filed.

Motion to Strike filed. (Filed By: Epitaph (A California Corp)(Defendant))

Memorandum of Points and Authorities (ISO Demurrer) filed.

Memorandum of Points and Authorities (ISO Demurrer) filed. (Filed By: Epitaph (A California Corp)(Defendant))

Declaration - Other (of Karyn Chandler) filed.

Declaration - Other (of Karyn Chandler) filed. (Filed By: Epitaph (A California Corp)(Defendant))

Memorandum of Points and Authorities (ISO Motion to Strike) filed.

Memorandum of Points and Authorities (ISO Motion to Strike) filed. (Filed By: Epitaph (A California Corp)(Defendant))

Declaration - Other (of Karyn Chandler) filed.

Declaration - Other (of Karyn Chandler) filed. (Filed By: Epitaph (A California Corp)(Defendant))

Motion to Strike filed.

Motion to Strike filed. (Filed By: Ace of Spades Concerts LLC(Defendant); Ace of Spades(Defendant); House of Blues Concerts Inc(Defendant); Live Nation Entertainment Inc(Defendant); Live Nation Worldwide Inc(Defendant))

Memorandum of Points and Authorities (in support of mtn to strike) filed.

Memorandum of Points and Authorities (in support of mtn to strike) filed. (Filed By: Ace of Spades Concerts LLC(Defendant); Ace of Spades(Defendant); House of Blues Concerts Inc(Defendant); Live Nation Entertainment Inc(Defendant); Live Nation Worldwide Inc(Defendant))

18 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/06/2019
  • DocketProof of Service filed. (Filed By: Live Nation Worldwide Inc(Defendant))

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/06/2019
  • DocketMemorandum of Points and Authorities (Amended - ISO Demurrer) filed. (Filed By: Live Nation Worldwide Inc(Defendant))

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/04/2019
  • DocketMotion to Strike - Civil Law and Motion scheduled for 10/03/2019 at 02:00:00 PM in Department 53 at Gordon D Schaber Courthouse .

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/04/2019
  • DocketHearing on Demurrer - Civil Law and Motion - Demurrer/JOP scheduled for 10/03/2019 at 02:00:00 PM in Department 53 at Gordon D Schaber Courthouse .

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/03/2019
  • DocketMotion to Strike - Civil Law and Motion scheduled for 10/03/2019 at 02:00:00 PM in Department 53 at Gordon D Schaber Courthouse .

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/03/2019
  • DocketHearing on Demurrer - Civil Law and Motion - Demurrer/JOP scheduled for 10/03/2019 at 02:00:00 PM in Department 53 at Gordon D Schaber Courthouse .

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service - MAILING filed. (Filed By: Ace of Spades Concerts LLC(Defendant); Ace of Spades(Defendant); House of Blues Concerts Inc(Defendant); Live Nation Entertainment Inc(Defendant); Live Nation Worldwide Inc(Defendant))

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest - Judicial Notice filed. (Filed By: Ace of Spades Concerts LLC(Defendant); Ace of Spades(Defendant); House of Blues Concerts Inc(Defendant); Live Nation Entertainment Inc(Defendant); Live Nation Worldwide Inc(Defendant))

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDeclaration - Other (Declaration of Raja Hafed in support of Demurrer) filed. (Filed By: Ace of Spades Concerts LLC(Defendant); Ace of Spades(Defendant); House of Blues Concerts Inc(Defendant); Live Nation Entertainment Inc(Defendant); Live Nation Worldwide Inc(Defendant))

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMemorandum of Points and Authorities filed. (Filed By: Ace of Spades Concerts LLC(Defendant); Ace of Spades(Defendant); House of Blues Concerts Inc(Defendant); Live Nation Entertainment Inc(Defendant); Live Nation Worldwide Inc(Defendant))

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
20 More Docket Entries
  • 08/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed. (Filed By: Hildebrand, Timothy(Plaintiff))

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed. (Filed By: Hildebrand, Timothy(Plaintiff))

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute filed. (Filed By: Ace of Spades(Defendant))

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute filed. (Filed By: Hildebrand, Timothy(Plaintiff))

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Conference - Case Management Program scheduled for 01/16/2020 at 08:30:00 AM in Department 23 at Gordon D Schaber Courthouse and the Notice of Case Management Conference and Order to Appear has been generated .

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/18/2019
  • DocketCase assigned to Department 23 .

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/19/2019
  • DocketSummons for 30-Day Summons was issued during case initiation on 07/19/2019 .

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed. (Filed By: Hildebrand, Timothy(Plaintiff))

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons filed. (Filed By: Hildebrand, Timothy(Plaintiff))

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint filed. (Filed By: Hildebrand, Timothy(Plaintiff))

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less