This case was last updated from Sacramento County Superior Courts on 04/15/2022 at 13:32:48 (UTC).

Thomas Leeper vs. Pius Kamber Construction. Inc., a California Corporation

Case Summary

On 02/22/2022 Thomas Leeper filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Pius Kamber Construction Inc , a California Corporation. This case was filed in Sacramento County Superior Courts, Gordon D Schaber Sacramento County Courthouse located in Sacramento, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********5793

  • Filing Date:

    02/22/2022

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Sacramento, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Leeper, Jennifer

Leeper, Thomas

Defendants

American Contractors Indemnity Company, a California Corporation

Does 1-50

Financial Pacific Insurance Company, a California corporation

Pius Kamber Construction. Inc., a California Corporation

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Matthew R Schoech

 

Court Documents

Complaint filed

Complaint filed

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed

Summons filed

Summons filed

Order - Other (Re: Delay in Scheduling Initial Case Management Conference) filed

Order - Other (Re: Delay in Scheduling Initial Case Management Conference) filed

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute filed

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute filed

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketROA Entry: Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute filed; Filed By: Leeper, Thomas(Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketROA Entry: Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed; Filed By: Leeper, Jennifer(Plaintiff); Leeper, Thomas(Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketROA Entry: Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed; Filed By: Leeper, Thomas(Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/23/2022
  • DocketROA Entry: Summons for 30-Day Summons was issued during case initiation on 02/23/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketROA Entry: Summons filed; Filed By: Leeper, Jennifer(Plaintiff); Leeper, Thomas(Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/22/2022
  • DocketROA Entry: Case assigned to Department 38

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketROA Entry: Order - Other (Re: Delay in Scheduling Initial Case Management Conference) filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketROA Entry: Civil Case Cover Sheet filed; Filed By: Leeper, Jennifer(Plaintiff); Leeper, Thomas(Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketROA Entry: Complaint filed; Filed By: Leeper, Jennifer(Plaintiff); Leeper, Thomas(Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where FINANCIAL PACIFIC INSURANCE COMPANY A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases where American Contractors Indemnity Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer SCHOECH, MATTHEW R