This case was last updated from Sacramento County Superior Courts on 09/29/2022 at 13:35:18 (UTC).

Thomas Cross vs. Tricolor Auto Group, LLC, a Delaware corporation

Case Summary

On 08/08/2022 Thomas Cross filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against Tricolor Auto Group, LLC, a Delaware corporation. This case was filed in Sacramento County Superior Courts, Gordon D Schaber Sacramento County Courthouse located in Sacramento, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********5056

  • Filing Date:

    08/08/2022

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • County, State:

    Sacramento, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

an individual on behalf of himself and on behalf of other persons similarly situated and aggrieved

Cross, Thomas

Defendants

Does 1-50

Tricolor Auto Group, LLC, a Delaware corporation

Tricolor California Auto Group, LLC, a Delaware corporation

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Matthew J Matern

 

Court Documents

Complaint filed

Complaint filed

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed

Summons filed

Summons filed

Order - Other (Notice and Order of Complex Case Determination) filed

Order - Other (Notice and Order of Complex Case Determination) filed

Notice of Jury Fee Deposit filed

Notice of Jury Fee Deposit filed

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketROA Entry: Notice of Jury Fee Deposit filed; Filed By: Cross, Thomas(Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketROA Entry: Order - Other (Notice and Order of Complex Case Determination) filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/17/2022
  • DocketROA Entry: Case reassigned to 25 effective 08/17/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/15/2022
  • DocketROA Entry: Designated a complex action on 08/15/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/15/2022
  • DocketROA Entry: Designated as an exceptional action on 08/15/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/15/2022
  • DocketROA Entry: Designated class action on 08/15/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketROA Entry: Summons filed; Filed By: Cross, Thomas(Plaintiff); an individual on behalf of himself and on behalf of other persons similarly situated and aggrieved(Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/08/2022
  • DocketROA Entry: Case assigned to Department 27

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketROA Entry: Civil Case Cover Sheet filed; Filed By: Cross, Thomas(Plaintiff); an individual on behalf of himself and on behalf of other persons similarly situated and aggrieved(Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketROA Entry: Complaint filed; Filed By: Cross, Thomas(Plaintiff); an individual on behalf of himself and on behalf of other persons similarly situated and aggrieved(Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where TRICOLOR AUTO GROUP LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where TRICOLOR CALIFORNIA AUTO GROUP LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer MATERN, MATTHEW J