This case was last updated from Sacramento County Superior Courts on 01/10/2023 at 03:18:58 (UTC).

The CIT Group/Commercial Services, Inc., assignee to Craftmaster Furniture Inc. vs. My Sofa Factory, a California corporation

Case Summary

On 09/01/2022 The CIT Group/Commercial Services, Inc , assignee to Craftmaster Furniture Inc filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against My Sofa Factory, a California corporation. This case was filed in Sacramento County Superior Courts, Gordon D Schaber Sacramento County Courthouse located in Sacramento, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********6131

  • Filing Date:

    09/01/2022

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Sacramento, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

The CIT Group/Commercial Services, Inc., assignee to Craftmaster Furniture Inc.

Defendants

Does 1-10

My Sofa Factory, a California corporation

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Alan L Brodkin

Defendant Attorney

Jaclyn L Powell

 

Court Documents

Complaint filed

Complaint filed

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed

Summons filed

Summons filed

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute filed

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute filed

Answer filed

Answer filed

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/23/2022
  • DocketROA Entry: Powell, Jaclyn L added as a effective 11/21/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketROA Entry: Answer filed; Filed By: My Sofa Factory, a California corporation(Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketROA Entry: Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute filed; Filed By: The CIT Group/Commercial Services, Inc., assignee to Craftmaster Furniture Inc.(Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketROA Entry: Summons filed; Filed By: The CIT Group/Commercial Services, Inc., assignee to Craftmaster Furniture Inc.(Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/02/2022
  • DocketROA Entry: Summons for 30-Day Summons was issued during case initiation on 09/02/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketROA Entry: Civil Case Cover Sheet filed; Filed By: The CIT Group/Commercial Services, Inc., assignee to Craftmaster Furniture Inc.(Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketROA Entry: Complaint filed; Filed By: The CIT Group/Commercial Services, Inc., assignee to Craftmaster Furniture Inc.(Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less