This case was last updated from Sacramento County Superior Courts on 12/12/2019 at 13:00:58 (UTC).

Terri Nguyenhoang Klein vs. Megan Cascille Weeden

Case Summary

On 11/14/2019 Terri Nguyenhoang Klein filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against Megan Cascille Weeden. This case was filed in Sacramento County Superior Courts, Gordon D Schaber Sacramento County Courthouse located in Sacramento, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********8984

  • Filing Date:

    11/14/2019

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Sacramento County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Gordon D Schaber Sacramento County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Sacramento, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Klein, Terri Nguyenhoang

Defendants

Bohn, Robert Lee

Weeden, Megan Cascille

Bohn, Brady Ivers

Does 1-100

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Robert A Heintz

 

Court Documents

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed.

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed. (Filed By: Klein, Terri(Plaintiff))

Summons filed.

Summons filed. (Filed By: Klein, Terri(Plaintiff))

Statement of Damages submitted by Heintz, Robert A rejected on 11/21/2019 .

Statement of Damages submitted by Heintz, Robert A rejected on 11/21/2019 . (Filed By: Heintz, Robert(Plaintiff))

Complaint filed.

Complaint filed. (Filed By: Klein, Terri(Plaintiff))

Case Management Conference - Case Management Program scheduled for 05/14/2020 at 08:30:00 AM in Department 39 at Gordon D Schaber Courthouse and the Notice of Case Management Conference and Order to Appear has been generated .

Case Management Conference - Case Management Program scheduled for 05/14/2020 at 08:30:00 AM in Department 39 at Gordon D Schaber Courthouse and the Notice of Case Management Conference and Order to Appear has been generated .

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatement of Damages submitted by Heintz, Robert A rejected on 11/21/2019 . (Filed By: Heintz, Robert(Plaintiff))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Conference - Case Management Program scheduled for 05/14/2020 at 08:30:00 AM in Department 39 at Gordon D Schaber Courthouse and the Notice of Case Management Conference and Order to Appear has been generated .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2019
  • DocketCase assigned to Department 39 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2019
  • DocketSummons for 30-Day Summons was issued during case initiation on 11/15/2019 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed. (Filed By: Klein, Terri(Plaintiff))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons filed. (Filed By: Klein, Terri(Plaintiff))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint filed. (Filed By: Klein, Terri(Plaintiff))

    Read MoreRead Less