This case was last updated from Sacramento County Superior Courts on 03/14/2022 at 20:17:05 (UTC).

Terri Branch vs. Diana Mahroom

Case Summary

On 02/17/2021 Terri Branch filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Diana Mahroom. This case was filed in Sacramento County Superior Courts, Gordon D Schaber Sacramento County Courthouse located in Sacramento, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********4647

  • Filing Date:

    02/17/2021

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Sacramento, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Branch, Terri

Defendants

Does 1-10

Mahroom, Diana

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Barry D Ammon

Defendant Attorney

Robert S Aaron

 

Court Documents

Summons filed.

Summons filed. (Filed By: Branch, Terri(Plaintiff))

Order - Other (Delay in Scheduling Initial Case Management Conference) filed.

Order - Other (Delay in Scheduling Initial Case Management Conference) filed.

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed.

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed. (Filed By: Branch, Terri(Plaintiff))

Complaint filed.

Complaint filed. (Filed By: Branch, Terri(Plaintiff))

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed

Answer (to Complaint) filed

Answer (to Complaint) filed

Clerk's Certificate of Service By Mail (out of process) generated

Clerk's Certificate of Service By Mail (out of process) generated

Order - Other (Scheduling of Case Management Conference) filed

Order - Other (Scheduling of Case Management Conference) filed

Tentative Ruling for Case Management Conference - Case Management Program set on 02/04/2022 08:30:00 AM published

Tentative Ruling for Case Management Conference - Case Management Program set on 02/04/2022 08:30:00 AM published

Case Management Statement filed

Case Management Statement filed

Minutes finalized for Case Management Conference - Case Management Program heard on 02/04/2022 08:30:00 AM

Minutes finalized for Case Management Conference - Case Management Program heard on 02/04/2022 08:30:00 AM

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/04/2022
  • DocketPast Hearings; Event Time: 8:30 AM; Event Type: Case Management Conference - Case Management Program; Department: 38; Status: Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketROA Entry: Minutes finalized for Case Management Conference - Case Management Program heard on 02/04/2022 08:30:00 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2022
  • DocketROA Entry: Case Referred to Trial Setting process for parties' selection of Trial date and Mandatory Settlement Conference date no later than 60 days after the effective date

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2022
  • DocketROA Entry: Case Referred to Trial Setting process for parties' selection of Trial date and Mandatory Settlement Conference date within 60 days of the referral date

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketROA Entry: Case Management Statement filed; Filed By: Branch, Terri(Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketROA Entry: Tentative Ruling for Case Management Conference - Case Management Program set on 02/04/2022 08:30:00 AM published

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketROA Entry: Clerk's Certificate of Service By Mail (out of process) generated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2021
  • DocketROA Entry: Case Management Conference - Case Management Program scheduled for 02/04/2022 at 08:30:00 AM in Department 38 at Gordon D Schaber Courthouse and the Notice of Case Management Conference and Order to Appear has been generated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketROA Entry: Order - Other (Scheduling of Case Management Conference) filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2021
  • DocketROA Entry: This case is reassigned from department 43 to department 38 for Case Management Program

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketROA Entry: Answer (to Complaint) filed; Filed By: Mahroom, Diana(Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketROA Entry: Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed; Filed By: Branch, Terri(Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2021
  • DocketROA Entry: Summons for 30-Day Summons was issued during case initiation on 02/19/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketROA Entry: Summons filed; Filed By: Branch, Terri(Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2021
  • DocketROA Entry: Case assigned to Department 43

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketROA Entry: Order - Other (Delay in Scheduling Initial Case Management Conference) filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketROA Entry: Civil Case Cover Sheet filed; Filed By: Branch, Terri(Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketROA Entry: Complaint filed; Filed By: Branch, Terri(Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer AARON, ROBERT S.