This case was last updated from Sacramento County Superior Courts on 07/16/2019 at 13:32:05 (UTC).

TD Bank USA, N.A. vs. Renita S Bryant

Case Summary

On 03/26/2019 TD Bank USA, N A filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against Renita S Bryant. This case was filed in Sacramento County Superior Courts, Gordon D Schaber Sacramento County Courthouse located in Sacramento, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********3298

  • Filing Date:

    03/26/2019

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Sacramento, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

TD Bank USA, N.A.

Defendants

Bryant, Renita S.

Does 1-10

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Mishaela J Graves

 

Court Documents

Statement of Venue filed.

Statement of Venue filed. (Filed By: TD Bank USA, N.A.(Plaintiff))

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed.

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed. (Filed By: TD Bank USA, N.A.(Plaintiff))

Summons filed.

Summons filed. (Filed By: TD Bank USA, N.A.(Plaintiff))

Complaint filed.

Complaint filed. (Filed By: TD Bank USA, N.A.(Plaintiff))

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed.

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed. (Filed By: TD Bank USA, N.A.(Plaintiff))

Request for Dismissal filed.

Request for Dismissal filed. (Filed By: TD Bank USA, N.A.(Plaintiff))

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/28/2019
  • DocketCase disposed with disposition of Request for Dismissal .

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/28/2019
  • DocketCase dismissed with disposition of Request for Dismissal .

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/05/2019
  • DocketComplaint disposed with disposition of Request for Dismissal .

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal filed. (Filed By: TD Bank USA, N.A.(Plaintiff))

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed. (Filed By: TD Bank USA, N.A.(Plaintiff))

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/28/2019
  • DocketSummons for 30-Day Summons was issued during case initiation on 03/28/2019 .

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatement of Venue filed. (Filed By: TD Bank USA, N.A.(Plaintiff))

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed. (Filed By: TD Bank USA, N.A.(Plaintiff))

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons filed. (Filed By: TD Bank USA, N.A.(Plaintiff))

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint filed. (Filed By: TD Bank USA, N.A.(Plaintiff))

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where TD Bank, NA is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer MISHAELA J GRAVES