This case was last updated from Sacramento County Superior Courts on 03/14/2023 at 13:07:30 (UTC).

Sylvia Martinez vs. ASPYR, LLC, a limited liability company

Case Summary

On 02/14/2023 Sylvia Martinez filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against ASPYR, LLC, a limited liability company. This case was filed in Sacramento County Superior Courts, Gordon D Schaber Sacramento County Courthouse located in Sacramento, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********4699

  • Filing Date:

    02/14/2023

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • County, State:

    Sacramento, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Martinez, Sylvia

on behalf of all others similarly situated

Defendants

ASPYR, LLC, a limited liability company

DHS1, LLC, a limited liability company

Does 1-10

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Kane Moon

 

Court Documents

Complaint filed

Complaint filed

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed

Summons filed

Summons filed

Notice and Order of Complex Case Determination filed

Notice and Order of Complex Case Determination filed

Notice of Related Case filed

Notice of Related Case filed

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/07/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketROA Entry: Notice of Related Case filed; Filed By: Martinez, Sylvia(Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/17/2023
  • DocketROA Entry: Case reassigned to 27 effective 02/17/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/17/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketROA Entry: Notice and Order of Complex Case Determination filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/15/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketROA Entry: Summons filed; Filed By: Martinez, Sylvia(Plaintiff); on behalf of all others similarly situated(Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/15/2023
  • DocketROA Entry: Designated a complex action on 02/15/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/14/2023
  • DocketROA Entry: Case assigned to Department 31

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/14/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketROA Entry: Civil Case Cover Sheet filed; Filed By: Martinez, Sylvia(Plaintiff); on behalf of all others similarly situated(Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/14/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketROA Entry: Complaint filed; Filed By: Martinez, Sylvia(Plaintiff); on behalf of all others similarly situated(Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less