This case was last updated from Sacramento County Superior Courts on 02/17/2023 at 07:47:37 (UTC).

Susan Schuler vs. FCA US LLC

Case Summary

On 01/31/2023 Susan Schuler filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against FCA US LLC. This case was filed in Sacramento County Superior Courts, Gordon D Schaber Sacramento County Courthouse located in Sacramento, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********3885

  • Filing Date:

    01/31/2023

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Sacramento, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Schuler, David

Schuler, Susan

Defendants

Does 1-10

FCA US LLC

Folsom Lake Chrysler Dodge Jeep Ram

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Tionna Dolin

 

Court Documents

Complaint filed

Complaint filed

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed

Case Management Conference - Case Management Program scheduled for 12/08/2023 at 08:30:00 AM in Department 38 at Gordon D Schaber Courthouse and the Notice of Case Management Conference and Order to Appear has been generated

Case Management Conference - Case Management Program scheduled for 12/08/2023 at 08:30:00 AM in Department 38 at Gordon D Schaber Courthouse and the Notice of Case Management Conference and Order to Appear has been generated

Summons filed

Summons filed

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/08/2023
  • HearingEvent Type: Case Management Conference - Case Management Program; Department: 38; Status: Scheduled

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/14/2023
  • DocketROA Entry: Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed; Filed By: Schuler, David(Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/01/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketROA Entry: Summons filed; Filed By: Schuler, David(Plaintiff); Schuler, Susan(Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/01/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketROA Entry: Case Management Conference - Case Management Program scheduled for 12/08/2023 at 08:30:00 AM in Department 38 at Gordon D Schaber Courthouse and the Notice of Case Management Conference and Order to Appear has been generated

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/31/2023
  • DocketROA Entry: Case assigned to Department 38

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/31/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketROA Entry: Civil Case Cover Sheet filed; Filed By: Schuler, David(Plaintiff); Schuler, Susan(Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/31/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketROA Entry: Complaint filed; Filed By: Schuler, David(Plaintiff); Schuler, Susan(Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less