This case was last updated from Sacramento County Superior Courts on 03/27/2022 at 05:01:55 (UTC).

STIVERS, MARK vs. ORBITZ WORLDWIDE, LLC

Case Summary

On 02/03/2022 STIVERS, MARK filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against ORBITZ WORLDWIDE, LLC. This case was filed in Sacramento County Superior Courts, Carol Miller Justice Center located in Sacramento, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****0241

  • Filing Date:

    02/03/2022

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Sacramento, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STIVERS, MARK

Defendant

ORBITZ WORLDWIDE, LLC

Not Yet Classified

NATIONAL REGISTERED AGENTS, INC

 

Court Documents

Proof of Service - COP

Proof of Service - COP

Attachments - Claim Item 3 (MC-031)

Attachments - Claim Item 3 (MC-031)

Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Defendant <= $1,500

Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Defendant <= $1,500

Authorization to Appear On Behalf of Party

Authorization to Appear On Behalf of Party

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Authorization to Appear On Behalf of Party; For: ORBITZ WORLDWIDE, LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2022
  • DocketDescription: Notice of In-person and Remote Hearing; For: STIVERS, MARK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2022
  • DocketDescription: Notice of In-person and Remote Hearing; For: ORBITZ WORLDWIDE, LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Proof of Service - COP; For: ORBITZ WORLDWIDE, LLC; Service Level: Valid; Recoverable: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Defendant <= $1,500; Hearing: 3/29/2022 8:15:00 AM; Type: General Case; Fee details; Fees Paid: $30.00; Deferred: $0.00; Waived: $0.00; Recoverable: $30.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Attachments - Claim Item 3 (MC-031)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Orbitz Worldwide, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where NATIONAL REGISTERED AGENTS is a litigant