This case was last updated from Sacramento County Superior Courts on 10/21/2019 at 13:31:25 (UTC).

Steven Villanueva vs. 3M Company, a Delaware Corporation

Case Summary

On 08/30/2019 Steven Villanueva filed an Other - Environment lawsuit against 3M Company, a Delaware Corporation. This case was filed in Sacramento County Superior Courts, Gordon D Schaber Sacramento County Courthouse located in Sacramento, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********3973

  • Filing Date:

    08/30/2019

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Other - Environment

  • County, State:

    Sacramento, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Villanueva, Steven

Defendants

BEHR Process Corporation

Henry Company LLC

Performance Coatings Inc

Pennzoil-Quaker State Company, a Delaware Corporation

AKZO Nobel Coatings Inc, a Delaware Corporation

T. Christy Enterprises LLC, a limited liability company as successor-in-interest to T. Christy Enterprises Inc

The B'Laster Corporation, an Ohio Corporation

Rust-Oleum Corporation, a Delaware Corporation

Champion Brands LLC, a Missouri limited liability Company

AMREP Inc, a Delaware Corporation

Home Depot USA Inc, a Delaware Corporation

Howard Products Inc

Kelly-Moore Paint Company, as successor-in-interest to Dunne Quality Paints

White Cap Construction Supply Inc, a Delaware Corporation

Benjamin Moore & Co, a New Jersey Corporation

Jamson Laboratories Inc, a Florida Corporation

Radiator Speciality Company, a North Carolina Corporation

Berco Redwood Inc

Green Products Company

16 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Raphael Metzger

 

Court Documents

Statement of Damages submitted by Villanueva, Seanne; Villanueva, Steven rejected on 09/04/2019 .

Statement of Damages submitted by Villanueva, Seanne; Villanueva, Steven rejected on 09/04/2019 . (Filed By: Villanueva, Seanne(Plaintiff); Villanueva, Steven(Plaintiff))

Case Management Conference - Case Management Program scheduled for 03/05/2020 at 08:30:00 AM in Department 23 at Gordon D Schaber Courthouse and the Notice of Case Management Conference and Order to Appear has been generated .

Case Management Conference - Case Management Program scheduled for 03/05/2020 at 08:30:00 AM in Department 23 at Gordon D Schaber Courthouse and the Notice of Case Management Conference and Order to Appear has been generated .

Notice of Jury Fee Deposit filed.

Notice of Jury Fee Deposit filed. (Filed By: Villanueva, Seanne(Plaintiff); Villanueva, Steven(Plaintiff))

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed.

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed. (Filed By: Villanueva, Seanne(Plaintiff); Villanueva, Steven(Plaintiff))

Summons filed.

Summons filed. (Filed By: Villanueva, Seanne(Plaintiff); Villanueva, Steven(Plaintiff))

Complaint filed.

Complaint filed. (Filed By: Villanueva, Seanne(Plaintiff); Villanueva, Steven(Plaintiff))

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/18/2019
  • Proof of Service - MAILING filed. (Filed By: Champion Brands LLC, a Missouri limited liability Company(Defendant))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2019
  • Proposed Order (Granting Motion to Strike) filed. (Filed By: Champion Brands LLC, a Missouri limited liability Company(Defendant))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2019
  • Memorandum of Points and Authorities (ISO Motion to Strike) filed. (Filed By: Champion Brands LLC, a Missouri limited liability Company(Defendant))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2019
  • Motion to Strike (POrtions of Plaintiffs Complaint) filed. (Filed By: Champion Brands LLC, a Missouri limited liability Company(Defendant))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2019
  • Proposed Order (Sustaining Def Demurrer) filed. (Filed By: Champion Brands LLC, a Missouri limited liability Company(Defendant))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2019
  • Declaration - Other (ISO Motion to Strike and Demurrer) filed. (Filed By: Champion Brands LLC, a Missouri limited liability Company(Defendant))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2019
  • Memorandum of Points and Authorities (ISO Plaintiffs Demurrer) filed. (Filed By: Champion Brands LLC, a Missouri limited liability Company(Defendant))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2019
  • Demurrer (To Plaintiffs Complaint) filed. (Filed By: Champion Brands LLC, a Missouri limited liability Company(Defendant))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/05/2019
  • Does 1-100 added as a Defendant effective 08/30/2019 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/05/2019
  • W.M. Barr & Company Inc, a Tennessee Corporation added as a Defendant effective 08/30/2019 .

    Read MoreRead Less
16 More Docket Entries
  • 09/05/2019
  • Jamson Laboratories Inc, a Florida Corporation added as a Defendant effective 08/30/2019 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/05/2019
  • Howard Products Inc added as a Defendant effective 08/30/2019 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Statement of Damages submitted by Villanueva, Seanne; Villanueva, Steven rejected on 09/04/2019 . (Filed By: Villanueva, Seanne(Plaintiff); Villanueva, Steven(Plaintiff))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Management Conference - Case Management Program scheduled for 03/05/2020 at 08:30:00 AM in Department 23 at Gordon D Schaber Courthouse and the Notice of Case Management Conference and Order to Appear has been generated .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2019
  • Case assigned to Department 23 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2019
  • Summons for 30-Day Summons was issued during case initiation on 09/04/2019 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Jury Fee Deposit filed. (Filed By: Villanueva, Seanne(Plaintiff); Villanueva, Steven(Plaintiff))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet filed. (Filed By: Villanueva, Seanne(Plaintiff); Villanueva, Steven(Plaintiff))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Summons filed. (Filed By: Villanueva, Seanne(Plaintiff); Villanueva, Steven(Plaintiff))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Complaint filed. (Filed By: Villanueva, Seanne(Plaintiff); Villanueva, Steven(Plaintiff))

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CHAMPION BRANDS INC is a litigant

Latest cases where Berco Redwood, Inc is a litigant

Latest cases where AMREP INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where PENNZOIL-QUAKER STATE COMPANY is a litigant