This case was last updated from Sacramento County Superior Courts on 02/09/2021 at 07:16:03 (UTC).

Steven Marcus vs. Douglas R. McCauley, Real Estate Commissioner

Case Summary

On 07/02/2020 Steven Marcus filed an Other - Writ Of Mandamus lawsuit against Douglas R McCauley, Real Estate Commissioner. This case was filed in Sacramento County Superior Courts, Gordon D Schaber Sacramento County Courthouse located in Sacramento, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********3420

  • Filing Date:

    07/02/2020

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Other - Writ Of Mandamus

  • County, State:

    Sacramento, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Marcus, Steven

Respondents

California Department of Real Estate

Douglas R. McCauley, Real Estate Commissioner

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorneys

Eric G Fernandez

Karen M Goodman

Respondent Attorney

Daniel W Robertson

 

Court Documents

Marcus v. Commissioner (Merits)

Marcus v. Commissioner (Merits)

Tentative Ruling Filed

Tentative Ruling Filed

Notice of Hearing (on Petition for Writ of Administrative Mandamus) filed.

Notice of Hearing (on Petition for Writ of Administrative Mandamus) filed. (Filed By: Marcus, Steven(Petitioner))

Trial Brief (Opening Brief in Support of Petition for Writ of Administrative Mandamus) filed.

Trial Brief (Opening Brief in Support of Petition for Writ of Administrative Mandamus) filed. (Filed By: Marcus, Steven(Petitioner))

Notice of Lodging (Administrative Record For Hearing On Writ Of Administrative Mandamus) filed.

Notice of Lodging (Administrative Record For Hearing On Writ Of Administrative Mandamus) filed. (Filed By: Marcus, Steven(Petitioner))

Proof of Service - PERSONAL filed.

Proof of Service - PERSONAL filed. (Filed By: Marcus, Steven(Petitioner))

Response (To Steven Marcus' Opening Brief) filed.

Response (To Steven Marcus' Opening Brief) filed. (Filed By: California Department of Real Estate(Respondent); Douglas R. McCauley, Real Estate Commissioner(Respondent))

Answer filed.

Answer filed. (Filed By: California Department of Real Estate(Respondent); Douglas R. McCauley, Real Estate Commissioner(Respondent))

Reply (Reply Brief in Support of Steven Marcus' Petition for Writ of Mandate) filed.

Reply (Reply Brief in Support of Steven Marcus' Petition for Writ of Mandate) filed. (Filed By: Marcus, Steven(Petitioner))

Minutes finalized for Petition for Writ of Mandate - Writ of Mandate heard on 11/20/2020 10:00:00 AM .

Minutes finalized for Petition for Writ of Mandate - Writ of Mandate heard on 11/20/2020 10:00:00 AM .

Proposed Judgment (Granting Petitioner's Petition for Writ of Administrative Mandamus) filed.

Proposed Judgment (Granting Petitioner's Petition for Writ of Administrative Mandamus) filed. (Filed By: Marcus, Steven(Petitioner))

Proposed Statement of Decision filed.

Proposed Statement of Decision filed. (Filed By: Marcus, Steven(Petitioner))

Judgment (Judgment Granting Petitioner's Petition for Writ of Administrative Mandamus (and Writ of Administrative Mandamus)) filed.

Judgment (Judgment Granting Petitioner's Petition for Writ of Administrative Mandamus (and Writ of Administrative Mandamus)) filed.

Statement of Decision filed.

Statement of Decision filed.

Notice of Entry of Judgment filed.

Notice of Entry of Judgment filed. (Filed By: Marcus, Steven(Petitioner))

Order After Hearing filed.

Order After Hearing filed.

Ex Parte Application - Other (for Stay of Enforcement OR for a TRO & OSC Re: Preliminary Injunction) filed.

Ex Parte Application - Other (for Stay of Enforcement OR for a TRO & OSC Re: Preliminary Injunction) filed. (Filed By: Marcus, Steven(Petitioner))

Memorandum of Points and Authorities (in Support of Application) filed.

Memorandum of Points and Authorities (in Support of Application) filed. (Filed By: Marcus, Steven(Petitioner))

16 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Entry of Judgment filed. (Filed By: Marcus, Steven(Petitioner))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2020
  • DocketJudgment entered .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2020
  • DocketPetition for Writ of Mandate disposed with disposition of Court finding .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2020
  • DocketCase disposed with disposition of Court finding .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJudgment (Judgment Granting Petitioner's Petition for Writ of Administrative Mandamus (and Writ of Administrative Mandamus)) filed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatement of Decision filed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProposed Judgment (Granting Petitioner's Petition for Writ of Administrative Mandamus) filed. (Filed By: Marcus, Steven(Petitioner))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProposed Statement of Decision filed. (Filed By: Marcus, Steven(Petitioner))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2020
  • DocketPast Hearings - Event Time: 10:00 AM; Event Type: Petition for Writ of Mandate - Writ of Mandate; Department: 17; Status: Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMinutes finalized for Petition for Writ of Mandate - Writ of Mandate heard on 11/20/2020 10:00:00 AM .

    Read MoreRead Less
17 More Docket Entries
  • 07/13/2020
  • DocketEx Parte Application for Stay - Writ of Mandate scheduled for 07/17/2020 at 01:30:00 PM in Department 17 at Gordon D Schaber Courthouse .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEx Parte Application - Other (for Stay of Enforcement OR for a TRO & OSC Re: Preliminary Injunction) filed. (Filed By: Marcus, Steven(Petitioner))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMemorandum of Points and Authorities (in Support of Application) filed. (Filed By: Marcus, Steven(Petitioner))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDeclaration - Other (of Steven Marcus in Support of Application) filed. (Filed By: Marcus, Steven(Petitioner))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest - Judicial Notice (in Support of Application) filed. (Filed By: Marcus, Steven(Petitioner))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProposed Order (Granting Application) filed. (Filed By: Marcus, Steven(Petitioner))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase initiation form printed .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPetition for Writ of Mandate filed. (Filed By: Marcus, Steven(Petitioner))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed. (Filed By: Marcus, Steven(Petitioner))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2020
  • DocketCase assigned to Department 17 .

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where California Dept. of Real Estate Broker is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer FERNANDEZ, ERIC G

Latest cases represented by Lawyer GOODMAN KAREN M. ESQ