This case was last updated from Sacramento County Superior Courts on 11/25/2021 at 13:33:47 (UTC).

Steven M Douglass vs. Auto Zoom Inc., a California Corporation

Case Summary

On 10/04/2021 Steven M Douglass filed a Contract - Business lawsuit against Auto Zoom Inc , a California Corporation. This case was filed in Sacramento County Superior Courts, Gordon D Schaber Sacramento County Courthouse located in Sacramento, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********9161

  • Filing Date:

    10/04/2021

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Business

  • County, State:

    Sacramento, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Douglass, Steven M.

Defendants

Auto Zoom Inc., a California Corporation

Does 1-10

Hudson Insurance Company, A Delaware Corporation

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Charles D Marshall

 

Court Documents

Order - Other (Delay in Scheduling Initial Case Management Conference) filed.

Order - Other (Delay in Scheduling Initial Case Management Conference) filed.

Summons filed.

Summons filed. (Filed By: Douglass, Steven(Plaintiff))

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed.

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed. (Filed By: Douglass, Steven(Plaintiff))

Complaint filed.

Complaint filed. (Filed By: Douglass, Steven(Plaintiff))

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed.

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed. (Filed By: Douglass, Steven(Plaintiff))

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute filed.

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute filed. (Filed By: Douglass, Steven(Plaintiff))

Answer submitted by Hudson Insurance Company, A Delaware Corporation rejected on 11/18/2021 .

Answer submitted by Hudson Insurance Company, A Delaware Corporation rejected on 11/18/2021 . (Filed By: Hudson Insurance Company, A Delaware Corporation(Defendant))

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAnswer submitted by Hudson Insurance Company, A Delaware Corporation rejected on 11/18/2021 . (Filed By: Hudson Insurance Company, A Delaware Corporation(Defendant))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute filed. (Filed By: Douglass, Steven(Plaintiff))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed. (Filed By: Douglass, Steven(Plaintiff))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons filed. (Filed By: Douglass, Steven(Plaintiff))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2021
  • DocketSummons for 30-Day Summons was issued during case initiation on 10/05/2021 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint filed. (Filed By: Douglass, Steven(Plaintiff))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed. (Filed By: Douglass, Steven(Plaintiff))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2021
  • DocketCase assigned to Department 38 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder - Other (Delay in Scheduling Initial Case Management Conference) filed.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Hudson Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer MARSHALL CHARLES DAVID