This case was last updated from Sacramento County Superior Courts on 03/19/2022 at 02:15:56 (UTC).

Steven Duppman vs. Vicki Brock

Case Summary

On 10/25/2021 Steven Duppman filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against Vicki Brock. This case was filed in Sacramento County Superior Courts, Gordon D Schaber Sacramento County Courthouse located in Sacramento, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0161

  • Filing Date:

    10/25/2021

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Sacramento, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Duppman, Steven

Defendants

Brock, Vicki

Does 1-10

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Joseph R Yates

Defendant Attorney

Patrick Gibbs

 

Court Documents

Summons filed.

Summons filed. (Filed By: Duppman, Steven(Plaintiff))

Order - Other (Delay in Scheduling Initial CMC) filed.

Order - Other (Delay in Scheduling Initial CMC) filed.

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed.

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed. (Filed By: Duppman, Steven(Plaintiff))

Complaint filed.

Complaint filed. (Filed By: Duppman, Steven(Plaintiff))

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed.

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed. (Filed By: Duppman, Steven(Plaintiff))

Answer (to Complaint) filed

Answer (to Complaint) filed

Notice of Jury Fee Deposit filed

Notice of Jury Fee Deposit filed

Demand for Jury Trial filed

Demand for Jury Trial filed

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketROA Entry: Demand for Jury Trial filed; Filed By: Brock, Vicki(Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketROA Entry: Notice of Jury Fee Deposit filed; Filed By: Brock, Vicki(Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketROA Entry: Answer (to Complaint) filed; Filed By: Brock, Vicki(Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketROA Entry: Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed; Filed By: Duppman, Steven(Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketROA Entry: Summons filed; Filed By: Duppman, Steven(Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/27/2021
  • DocketROA Entry: Summons for 30-Day Summons was issued during case initiation on 10/27/2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/25/2021
  • DocketROA Entry: Case assigned to Department 38

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketROA Entry: Order - Other (Delay in Scheduling Initial CMC) filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketROA Entry: Civil Case Cover Sheet filed; Filed By: Duppman, Steven(Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketROA Entry: Complaint filed; Filed By: Duppman, Steven(Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer YATES JOSEPH RUDOLPH