This case was last updated from Sacramento County Superior Courts on 02/01/2019 at 13:49:05 (UTC).

Stephani Mallen vs. David Alvarado Gonzalez

Case Summary

On 08/06/2018 Stephani Mallen filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against David Alvarado Gonzalez. This case was filed in Sacramento County Superior Courts, Gordon D Schaber Sacramento County Courthouse located in Sacramento, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********8483

  • Filing Date:

    08/06/2018

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Courthouse:

    Gordon D Schaber Sacramento County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Sacramento, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Lujan, Natalie

Mallen, Stephani

Mallen, Mildred M.

Defendants

Does 1-10

Herrera, Efrain Alvarado

Gonzalez, David Alvarado

Guardian Ad Litem

Lujan, Phillip T.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Shanie N Bradley

Defendant Attorney

Lili Jalali

 

Court Documents

Motion for Preference filed.

Motion for Preference filed. (Filed By: Mallen, Stephani(Plaintiff))

Proposed Order (for Preference) filed.

Proposed Order (for Preference) filed. (Filed By: Mallen, Stephani(Plaintiff))

Tentative Ruling for Motion for Preference - PJ Law & Motion set on 01/08/2019 09:30:00 AM published .

Tentative Ruling for Motion for Preference - PJ Law & Motion set on 01/08/2019 09:30:00 AM published .

Minutes finalized for Motion for Preference - PJ Law & Motion heard on 01/08/2019 09:30:00 AM .

Minutes finalized for Motion for Preference - PJ Law & Motion heard on 01/08/2019 09:30:00 AM .

Motion - Other (To Advance Case for Trial) filed.

Motion - Other (To Advance Case for Trial) filed. (Filed By: Mallen, Stephani(Plaintiff))

Notice of Motion (Amended Notice of Motion and Motion to Advance Case for Trial) filed.

Notice of Motion (Amended Notice of Motion and Motion to Advance Case for Trial) filed. (Filed By: Mallen, Stephani(Plaintiff))

Supplemental - Other (Declaration of Shanie N Bradley ISO Motion to Advance Case for Trial) filed.

Supplemental - Other (Declaration of Shanie N Bradley ISO Motion to Advance Case for Trial) filed. (Filed By: Mallen, Stephani(Plaintiff))

Answer (to Complaint) filed.

Answer (to Complaint) filed. (Filed By: Gonzalez, David(Defendant); Herrera, Efrain(Defendant))

Notice of Jury Fee Deposit filed.

Notice of Jury Fee Deposit filed. (Filed By: Gonzalez, David(Defendant); Herrera, Efrain(Defendant))

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute filed.

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute filed. (Filed By: Lujan, Natalie(Plaintiff); Mallen, Mildred(Plaintiff); Mallen, Stephani(Plaintiff))

Order Appointing Guardian Ad Litem filed.

Order Appointing Guardian Ad Litem filed.

Complaint filed.

Complaint filed. (Filed By: Lujan, Natalie(Plaintiff); Mallen, Mildred(Plaintiff); Mallen, Stephani(Plaintiff))

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed.

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed. (Filed By: Lujan, Natalie(Plaintiff); Mallen, Mildred(Plaintiff); Mallen, Stephani(Plaintiff))

Application and Proposed Order for Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem filed.

Application and Proposed Order for Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem filed. (Filed By: Lujan, Natalie(Plaintiff))

Summons filed.

Summons filed. (Filed By: Lujan, Natalie(Plaintiff); Mallen, Mildred(Plaintiff); Mallen, Stephani(Plaintiff))

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/08/2019
  • Past Hearings - Event Time: 9:30 AM; Event Type: Motion for Preference - PJ Law & Motion; Department: 47; Status: Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Supplemental - Other (Declaration of Shanie N Bradley ISO Motion to Advance Case for Trial) filed. (Filed By: Mallen, Stephani(Plaintiff))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Motion (Amended Notice of Motion and Motion to Advance Case for Trial) filed. (Filed By: Mallen, Stephani(Plaintiff))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2019
  • Motion - Other - PJ Law and Motion scheduled for 02/19/2019 at 09:30:00 AM in Department 47 at Gordon D Schaber Courthouse .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Motion - Other (To Advance Case for Trial) filed. (Filed By: Mallen, Stephani(Plaintiff))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Minutes finalized for Motion for Preference - PJ Law & Motion heard on 01/08/2019 09:30:00 AM .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Tentative Ruling for Motion for Preference - PJ Law & Motion set on 01/08/2019 09:30:00 AM published .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2018
  • Motion for Preference - PJ Law & Motion scheduled for 01/08/2019 at 09:30:00 AM in Department 47 at Gordon D Schaber Courthouse .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Proposed Order (for Preference) filed. (Filed By: Mallen, Stephani(Plaintiff))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Motion for Preference filed. (Filed By: Mallen, Stephani(Plaintiff))

    Read MoreRead Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 10/02/2018
  • Jalali, Lili added as a effective 10/01/2018 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2018
  • Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute filed. (Filed By: Lujan, Natalie(Plaintiff); Mallen, Mildred(Plaintiff); Mallen, Stephani(Plaintiff))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute filed. (Filed By: Lujan, Natalie(Plaintiff); Mallen, Mildred(Plaintiff); Mallen, Stephani(Plaintiff))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Summons filed. (Filed By: Lujan, Natalie(Plaintiff); Mallen, Mildred(Plaintiff); Mallen, Stephani(Plaintiff))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Order Appointing Guardian Ad Litem filed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2018
  • Lujan, Phillip T. added as a Guardian Ad Litem CR effective 08/10/2018 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2018
  • Application for Guardian ad Litem and Summons forwarded to D 53

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Application and Proposed Order for Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem filed. (Filed By: Lujan, Natalie(Plaintiff))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet filed. (Filed By: Lujan, Natalie(Plaintiff); Mallen, Mildred(Plaintiff); Mallen, Stephani(Plaintiff))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Complaint filed. (Filed By: Lujan, Natalie(Plaintiff); Mallen, Mildred(Plaintiff); Mallen, Stephani(Plaintiff))

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Shanie N Bradley