This case was last updated from Sacramento County Superior Courts on 01/08/2023 at 08:13:23 (UTC).

State Water Resources Board Curtailment Cases

Case Summary

On 05/20/2022 State Water Resources Board Curtailment Cases was filed as an Other lawsuit. This case was filed in Sacramento County Superior Courts, Gordon D Schaber Sacramento County Courthouse located in Sacramento, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****5229

  • Filing Date:

    05/20/2022

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Sacramento, California

 

Party Details

Petitioners

Banta-Carbona Irrigation District

Byron-Bethany Irrigation District

Central Delta Water Agency

Merced Irrigation District

Modesto Irrigation District

Patterson Irrigation District

San Joaquin Tributaries Authority

South Delta Water Agency

South San Joaquin Irrigation District

Turlock Irrigation District

West Stanislaus Irrigation District

Respondents

Erik Ekdahl as Deputy Director of State Water Resources Control Board

State Water Resources Control Board

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorneys

Jennifer L Spaletta

Steven Herum

Michael E Vergara

John Herrick

S Dean Ruiz

Dante J Nomellini, Sr

Phillip R McMurray

Thomas M Berliner

William C Paris

Arthur F Godwin

Respondent Attorneys

Tracy L Winsor

Daniel M Fuchs

Kate D. Fritz

Colleen R Flannery

Rob Bonta

Matthew G Bullock

Annadel A. Almendras

 

Court Documents

Order Granting Coordination 07/06/2022

Order Granting Coordination 07/06/2022

Order Granting Coordination - Certificate of Mailing 07/06/2022

Order Granting Coordination - Certificate of Mailing 07/06/2022

Minutes finalized for heard on 07/27/2022 04:18:00 PM

Minutes finalized for heard on 07/27/2022 04:18:00 PM

Correspondence (Request from moving party to vacate ex parte hearing on 7/29/2022) filed

Correspondence (Request from moving party to vacate ex parte hearing on 7/29/2022) filed

Declaration - Other (Declaration in Support of Opposition to Ex Parte Application) filed

Declaration - Other (Declaration in Support of Opposition to Ex Parte Application) filed

Request - Judicial Notice (Request for Judicial Notice in Support of Opposition to Ex Parte Application) filed

Request - Judicial Notice (Request for Judicial Notice in Support of Opposition to Ex Parte Application) filed

Objection (Evidentiary Objection to Ex Parte Application) filed

Objection (Evidentiary Objection to Ex Parte Application) filed

Opposition (Opposition to Ex Parte Application) filed

Opposition (Opposition to Ex Parte Application) filed

Clerk's Certificate of Service By Mail (Minute Order) generated

Clerk's Certificate of Service By Mail (Minute Order) generated

Minutes finalized for heard on 07/14/2022 08:00:00 AM

Minutes finalized for heard on 07/14/2022 08:00:00 AM

Declaration - Other (Declaration in Support of Ex Parte Application) filed

Declaration - Other (Declaration in Support of Ex Parte Application) filed

Declaration - Other (Declaration in Support of Ex Parte Application) filed

Declaration - Other (Declaration in Support of Ex Parte Application) filed

Declaration - Other (Declaration in Support of Ex Parte Application) filed

Declaration - Other (Declaration in Support of Ex Parte Application) filed

Declaration - Other (Declaration in Support of Ex Parte Application) filed

Declaration - Other (Declaration in Support of Ex Parte Application) filed

Declaration - Other (Declaration in Support of Ex Parte Application) filed

Declaration - Other (Declaration in Support of Ex Parte Application) filed

Proposed Order (Proposed Order Granting Temporary Restraining Order and Order to Show Cause) filed

Proposed Order (Proposed Order Granting Temporary Restraining Order and Order to Show Cause) filed

Ex Parte Application - Other (Ex Parte Application for Temporary Restraining Order and Order to Show Cause) filed

Ex Parte Application - Other (Ex Parte Application for Temporary Restraining Order and Order to Show Cause) filed

Declaration - Other (Service of Declaration of Daniel M. Fuchs in Support of Opp of Respondents SWRCB and Erik Ekdahl to Modification of Stay and Non-Opp to Expedited Coordination Hearing) filed

Declaration - Other (Service of Declaration of Daniel M. Fuchs in Support of Opp of Respondents SWRCB and Erik Ekdahl to Modification of Stay and Non-Opp to Expedited Coordination Hearing) filed

39 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketROA Entry: Minutes finalized for heard on 07/27/2022 04:18:00 PM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketROA Entry: Correspondence (Request from moving party to vacate ex parte hearing on 7/29/2022) filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/27/2022
  • DocketROA Entry: Ex Parte Appearance/Hearing - Ex Parte Calendar scheduled for 07/29/2022 at 09:30:00 AM in Department 27 at Gordon D Schaber Courthouse was vacated

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketROA Entry: Declaration - Other (Declaration in Support of Opposition to Ex Parte Application) filed; Filed By: Erik Ekdahl as Deputy Director of State Water Resources Control Board(Defendant); State Water Resources Control Board(Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketROA Entry: Request - Judicial Notice (Request for Judicial Notice in Support of Opposition to Ex Parte Application) filed; Filed By: Erik Ekdahl as Deputy Director of State Water Resources Control Board(Defendant); State Water Resources Control Board(Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketROA Entry: Objection (Evidentiary Objection to Ex Parte Application) filed; Filed By: Erik Ekdahl as Deputy Director of State Water Resources Control Board(Defendant); State Water Resources Control Board(Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketROA Entry: Opposition (Opposition to Ex Parte Application) filed; Filed By: Erik Ekdahl as Deputy Director of State Water Resources Control Board(Defendant); State Water Resources Control Board(Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketROA Entry: Clerk's Certificate of Service By Mail (Minute Order) generated

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketROA Entry: Minutes finalized for heard on 07/14/2022 08:00:00 AM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/14/2022
  • DocketROA Entry: The Ex Parte Appearance/Hearing - Ex Parte Calendar is scheduled for 07/29/2022 at 09:30 AM in Department 27

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
53 More Docket Entries
  • 05/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketROA Entry: Declaration - Other (Declaration in Support of Request for Judicial Notice and in Partial Opposition to Motion for Stay) filed; Filed By: Modesto Irrigation District(Petitioner); San Joaquin Tributaries Authority(Petitioner); South San Joaquin Irrigation District(Petitioner); Turlock Irrigation District(Petitioner)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketROA Entry: Opposition (Partial Opposition to Motion for Stay) filed; Filed By: Modesto Irrigation District(Petitioner); San Joaquin Tributaries Authority(Petitioner); South San Joaquin Irrigation District(Petitioner); Turlock Irrigation District(Petitioner)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketROA Entry: Declaration - Other (Declaration in Support of Motion for Stay) filed; Filed By: Erik Ekdahl as Deputy Director of State Water Resources Control Board(Respondent); State Water Resources Control Board(Respondent)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketROA Entry: Memorandum of Points and Authorities (Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of Motion for Stay) filed; Filed By: Erik Ekdahl as Deputy Director of State Water Resources Control Board(Respondent); State Water Resources Control Board(Respondent)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketROA Entry: Motion for Order to Stay Proceedings filed; Filed By: Erik Ekdahl as Deputy Director of State Water Resources Control Board(Respondent); State Water Resources Control Board(Respondent)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketROA Entry: Notice - Other (Notice of Complex Case Determinations) filed; Filed By: Byron-Bethany Irrigation District(Petitioner)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketROA Entry: Proof of Service - MAILING filed; Filed By: Byron-Bethany Irrigation District(Petitioner)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketROA Entry: Declaration - Other (Declaration in Support of Petition for Coordination) filed; Filed By: Byron-Bethany Irrigation District(Petitioner)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketROA Entry: Petition for Coordination - JCCP filed; Filed By: Byron-Bethany Irrigation District(Petitioner)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketROA Entry: Judicial Council Order Assigning Coordination Motion Judge

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less