This case was last updated from Sacramento County Superior Courts on 03/16/2022 at 04:57:49 (UTC).

State of California , By And Through The Department of Water Resources vs. Ricahrd Case Elliot & Elliot Family Revocable Trust

Case Summary

On 06/08/2021 State of California , By And Through The Department of Water Resources filed a Property - Eminent Domain lawsuit against Ricahrd Case Elliot Elliot Family Revocable Trust. This case was filed in Sacramento County Superior Courts, Gordon D Schaber Sacramento County Courthouse located in Sacramento, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********2119

  • Filing Date:

    06/08/2021

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Property - Eminent Domain

  • County, State:

    Sacramento, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

State of California , By And Through The Department of Water Resources

Respondent

Ricahrd Case Elliot & Elliot Family Revocable Trust

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

Christine E Garske

 

Court Documents

Order - Other (Re: Delay In Scheduling Initial Case Management Conference) filed.

Order - Other (Re: Delay In Scheduling Initial Case Management Conference) filed. (Filed By: State of California , By And Through The Department of Water Resources(Petitioner))

Declaration - Other (of Allan T. Davis in support of Petition for Order Permitting Entry adn Investigation of Real Property) filed.

Declaration - Other (of Allan T. Davis in support of Petition for Order Permitting Entry adn Investigation of Real Property) filed. (Filed By: State of California , By And Through The Department of Water Resources(Petitioner))

Declaration - Other (of Katherine Marquez in support of Petition for Order Permitting Entry adn Investigation of Real Property) filed.

Declaration - Other (of Katherine Marquez in support of Petition for Order Permitting Entry adn Investigation of Real Property) filed. (Filed By: State of California , By And Through The Department of Water Resources(Petitioner))

Declaration - Other (of Andrew Finney in support of Petition for Order Permitting Entry and Investigation of Real Property) filed.

Declaration - Other (of Andrew Finney in support of Petition for Order Permitting Entry and Investigation of Real Property) filed. (Filed By: State of California , By And Through The Department of Water Resources(Petitioner))

Declaration - Other (of Deputy Attorney General Kelly T. Smith in support of Petition for Order Permittng Entry and Investigation of Real Property) filed.

Declaration - Other (of Deputy Attorney General Kelly T. Smith in support of Petition for Order Permittng Entry and Investigation of Real Property) filed. (Filed By: State of California , By And Through The Department of Water Resources(Petitioner))

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed.

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed. (Filed By: State of California , By And Through The Department of Water Resources(Petitioner))

Petition-Other (Civil Unlimited) filed.

Petition-Other (Civil Unlimited) filed. (Filed By: State of California , By And Through The Department of Water Resources(Petitioner))

Notice of Entry of Order filed

Notice of Entry of Order filed

Clerk's Certificate of Service By Mail (out of process) generated

Clerk's Certificate of Service By Mail (out of process) generated

Order - Other (Scheduling of Case Management Conference) filed

Order - Other (Scheduling of Case Management Conference) filed

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/01/2022
  • HearingEvent Type: Case Management Conference - Case Management Program; Department: 38; Status: Scheduled

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketROA Entry: Clerk's Certificate of Service By Mail (out of process) generated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2022
  • DocketROA Entry: Case Management Conference - Case Management Program scheduled for 04/01/2022 at 08:30:00 AM in Department 38 at Gordon D Schaber Courthouse and the Notice of Case Management Conference and Order to Appear has been generated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketROA Entry: Order - Other (Scheduling of Case Management Conference) filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketROA Entry: Notice of Entry of Order filed; Filed By: State of California , By And Through The Department of Water Resources(Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2021
  • DocketROA Entry: This case is reassigned from department 43 to department 38 for Case Management Program

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketROA Entry: Order - Other (Re: Delay In Scheduling Initial Case Management Conference) filed; Filed By: State of California , By And Through The Department of Water Resources(Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2021
  • DocketROA Entry: Case assigned to Department 43

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketROA Entry: Declaration - Other (of Allan T. Davis in support of Petition for Order Permitting Entry adn Investigation of Real Property) filed; Filed By: State of California , By And Through The Department of Water Resources(Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketROA Entry: Declaration - Other (of Katherine Marquez in support of Petition for Order Permitting Entry adn Investigation of Real Property) filed; Filed By: State of California , By And Through The Department of Water Resources(Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketROA Entry: Declaration - Other (of Andrew Finney in support of Petition for Order Permitting Entry and Investigation of Real Property) filed; Filed By: State of California , By And Through The Department of Water Resources(Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketROA Entry: Declaration - Other (of Deputy Attorney General Kelly T. Smith in support of Petition for Order Permittng Entry and Investigation of Real Property) filed; Filed By: State of California , By And Through The Department of Water Resources(Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketROA Entry: Civil Case Cover Sheet filed; Filed By: State of California , By And Through The Department of Water Resources(Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketROA Entry: Petition-Other (Civil Unlimited) filed; Filed By: State of California , By And Through The Department of Water Resources(Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Garske, Christine E