This case was last updated from Sacramento County Superior Courts on 07/17/2023 at 22:51:49 (UTC).

State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company vs. Patrick Walubengo

Case Summary

On 02/02/2023 State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company filed a Not Yet Classified lawsuit against Patrick Walubengo. This case was filed in Sacramento County Superior Courts, Gordon D Schaber Sacramento County Courthouse located in Sacramento, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-GDS

  • Filing Date:

    02/02/2023

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Not Yet Classified

  • County, State:

    Sacramento, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company

 

Court Documents

Complaint

02/02/2023; Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet

02/02/2023; Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons

02/03/2023; Summons

Proof of Personal Service

05/16/2023; Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service

06/02/2023; Proof of Personal Service

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/02/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketName: Proof of Personal Service; Filed By: State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/02/2023
  • DocketMessage: Proof of Personal Service Filed by: State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company (Plaintiff) As to: Patrick Walubengo (Defendant) Service Date: 05/11/2023 Service Cost Waived: No; Category: Document

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/16/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketName: Proof of Personal Service; Filed By: State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/16/2023
  • DocketMessage: Proof of Personal Service Filed by: State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company (Plaintiff) As to: DirecTV, LLC (Defendant) Service Date: 05/12/23 Service Cost Waived: No; Category: Document

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/03/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketName: Summons; Filed By: State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/03/2023
  • DocketName: RECEIPT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/03/2023
  • DocketMessage: Summons for 30-Day Summons was issued during case initiation on 02/03/2023 .; Category: Case

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/03/2023
  • DocketMessage: Summons filed. Filed By: State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company (Plaintiff); Category: Document

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/02/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketName: Civil Case Cover Sheet; Filed By: State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/02/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketName: Complaint; Filed By: State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/02/2023
  • DocketMessage: Civil Case Cover Sheet filed. Filed By: State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company (Plaintiff); Category: Document

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/02/2023
  • DocketMessage: Complaint filed. Filed By: State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company (Plaintiff); Category: Document

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less