This case was last updated from Sacramento County Superior Courts on 03/14/2022 at 21:28:53 (UTC).

State Farm General Insurance Company vs. City of Folsom

Case Summary

On 02/22/2021 State Farm General Insurance Company filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against City of Folsom. This case was filed in Sacramento County Superior Courts, Gordon D Schaber Sacramento County Courthouse located in Sacramento, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********4971

  • Filing Date:

    02/22/2021

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Sacramento, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

State Farm General Insurance Company

Defendants

City of Folsom

Does 1-25

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Darrel K. Yasutake

 

Court Documents

Summons filed.

Summons filed. (Filed By: State Farm General Insurance Company(Plaintiff))

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed.

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed. (Filed By: State Farm General Insurance Company(Plaintiff))

Complaint filed.

Complaint filed. (Filed By: State Farm General Insurance Company(Plaintiff))

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed.

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed. (Filed By: State Farm General Insurance Company(Plaintiff))

Request for Dismissal filed

Request for Dismissal filed

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/13/2021
  • DocketROA Entry: Complaint disposed with disposition of Request for Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2021
  • DocketROA Entry: Case disposed with disposition of Request for Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2021
  • DocketROA Entry: Case dismissed with disposition of Request for Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketROA Entry: Request for Dismissal filed; Filed By: State Farm General Insurance Company(Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketROA Entry: Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed; Filed By: State Farm General Insurance Company(Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2021
  • DocketROA Entry: Summons for 30-Day Summons was issued during case initiation on 02/24/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketROA Entry: Summons filed; Filed By: State Farm General Insurance Company(Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketROA Entry: Civil Case Cover Sheet filed; Filed By: State Farm General Insurance Company(Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketROA Entry: Complaint filed; Filed By: State Farm General Insurance Company(Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where City of Folsom is a litigant

Latest cases where State Farm General Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer YASUTAKE, DARREL K