This case was last updated from Sacramento County Superior Courts on 06/04/2021 at 13:32:04 (UTC).

State Compensation Insurance Fund vs. Dave Anderson Company

Case Summary

On 04/13/2021 State Compensation Insurance Fund filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against Dave Anderson Company. This case was filed in Sacramento County Superior Courts, Gordon D Schaber Sacramento County Courthouse located in Sacramento, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********8636

  • Filing Date:

    04/13/2021

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Courthouse:

    Gordon D Schaber Sacramento County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Sacramento, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

State Compensation Insurance Fund

Defendants

Company, Dave Anderson

Does 1-20

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Pamela A Wilson

 

Court Documents

Request for Dismissal filed.

Request for Dismissal filed. (Filed By: State Compensation Insurance Fund(Plaintiff))

Complaint filed.

Complaint filed. (Filed By: State Compensation Insurance Fund(Plaintiff))

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed.

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed. (Filed By: State Compensation Insurance Fund(Plaintiff))

Summons filed.

Summons filed. (Filed By: State Compensation Insurance Fund(Plaintiff))

Order - Other (Delay in Scheduling Initial Case Management Conference) filed.

Order - Other (Delay in Scheduling Initial Case Management Conference) filed.

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/06/2021
  • DocketComplaint disposed with disposition of Request for Dismissal .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal filed. (Filed By: State Compensation Insurance Fund(Plaintiff))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2021
  • DocketCase dismissed with disposition of Request for Dismissal .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2021
  • DocketCase disposed with disposition of Request for Dismissal .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • DocketSummons for 30-Day Summons was issued during case initiation on 04/16/2021 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint filed. (Filed By: State Compensation Insurance Fund(Plaintiff))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed. (Filed By: State Compensation Insurance Fund(Plaintiff))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons filed. (Filed By: State Compensation Insurance Fund(Plaintiff))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder - Other (Delay in Scheduling Initial Case Management Conference) filed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2021
  • DocketCase assigned to Department 31 .

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where STATE COMPENSATION INSURANCE FUND is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer WILSON PAMELA A.