This case was last updated from Sacramento County Superior Courts on 02/07/2021 at 23:31:40 (UTC).

Sondra Hernandez vs. Benefit Cosmetics LLC

Case Summary

On 05/06/2020 Sondra Hernandez filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against Benefit Cosmetics LLC. This case was filed in Sacramento County Superior Courts, Gordon D Schaber Sacramento County Courthouse located in Sacramento, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********8210

  • Filing Date:

    05/06/2020

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • County, State:

    Sacramento, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Hernandez, Sondra

all others similarly situated

Defendants

Does 1-50

Benefit Cosmetics LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

William L. Marder

Larry W Lee

Defendant Attorney

Emilie C Woodhead

 

Court Documents

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed.

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed. (Filed By: Hernandez, Sondra(Plaintiff); all others similarly situated(Plaintiff))

Summons filed.

Summons filed. (Filed By: Hernandez, Sondra(Plaintiff); all others similarly situated(Plaintiff))

Complaint filed.

Complaint filed. (Filed By: Hernandez, Sondra(Plaintiff); all others similarly situated(Plaintiff))

Clerk's Certificate of Service By Mail (out of process) generated .

Clerk's Certificate of Service By Mail (out of process) generated .

Order - Other (Notice of Case Management Conference and Complex Case Management Procedures) filed.

Order - Other (Notice of Case Management Conference and Complex Case Management Procedures) filed.

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed.

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed. (Filed By: Hernandez, Sondra(Plaintiff))

Clerk's Certificate of Service By Mail (Minute Order) generated .

Clerk's Certificate of Service By Mail (Minute Order) generated .

Notice and Order of Complex Case Determination filed.

Notice and Order of Complex Case Determination filed.

Notice of Withdrawal of Counsel filed.

Notice of Withdrawal of Counsel filed. (Filed By: Benefit Cosmetics LLC(Defendant))

Returned Mail

Returned Mail

Joint Case Management Statement (and [Proposed] Order) filed.

Joint Case Management Statement (and [Proposed] Order) filed. (Filed By: Benefit Cosmetics LLC(Defendant); Hernandez, Sondra(Plaintiff))

Case Management Conference - Complex rescheduled to 03/05/2021 at 10:00:00 AM in Department 32 at Gordon D Schaber Courthouse .

Case Management Conference - Complex rescheduled to 03/05/2021 at 10:00:00 AM in Department 32 at Gordon D Schaber Courthouse .

Order - Other (RE: CONTINUANCE FROM 9/24/2020 TO 3/5/2021) filed.

Order - Other (RE: CONTINUANCE FROM 9/24/2020 TO 3/5/2021) filed.

Joint Case Management Statement (and [Proposed] Order) filed.

Joint Case Management Statement (and [Proposed] Order) filed. (Filed By: Benefit Cosmetics LLC(Defendant); Hernandez, Sondra(Plaintiff))

Answer (To Complaint) filed.

Answer (To Complaint) filed. (Filed By: Benefit Cosmetics LLC(Defendant))

Notice - Other (of Case Management Conference and Complex Case Management Procedures) filed.

Notice - Other (of Case Management Conference and Complex Case Management Procedures) filed. (Filed By: Hernandez, Sondra(Plaintiff); all others similarly situated(Plaintiff))

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/05/2021
  • HearingEvent Type: Case Management Conference - Complex; Department: 32; Status: Scheduled

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Withdrawal of Counsel filed. (Filed By: Benefit Cosmetics LLC(Defendant))

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketReturned Mail

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Conference - Complex rescheduled to 03/05/2021 at 10:00:00 AM in Department 32 at Gordon D Schaber Courthouse .

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/18/2020
  • DocketCase Management Conference - Complex scheduled for 03/05/2021 at 10:00:00 AM in Department 32 at Gordon D Schaber Courthouse .

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder - Other (RE: CONTINUANCE FROM 9/24/2020 TO 3/5/2021) filed.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJoint Case Management Statement (and [Proposed] Order) filed. (Filed By: Benefit Cosmetics LLC(Defendant); Hernandez, Sondra(Plaintiff))

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJoint Case Management Statement (and [Proposed] Order) filed. (Filed By: Benefit Cosmetics LLC(Defendant); Hernandez, Sondra(Plaintiff))

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/05/2020
  • DocketWoodhead, Emilie C added as a effective 07/07/2020 .

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAnswer (To Complaint) filed. (Filed By: Benefit Cosmetics LLC(Defendant))

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
5 More Docket Entries
  • 06/17/2020
  • DocketClerk's Certificate of Service By Mail (Minute Order) generated .

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketClerk's Certificate of Service By Mail (Minute Order) generated .

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/17/2020
  • DocketCase reassigned to 32 effective 06/15/2020 .

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice and Order of Complex Case Determination filed.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed. (Filed By: Hernandez, Sondra(Plaintiff))

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/12/2020
  • DocketDesignated a complex action on 05/12/2020 .

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint filed. (Filed By: Hernandez, Sondra(Plaintiff); all others similarly situated(Plaintiff))

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons filed. (Filed By: Hernandez, Sondra(Plaintiff); all others similarly situated(Plaintiff))

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed. (Filed By: Hernandez, Sondra(Plaintiff); all others similarly situated(Plaintiff))

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/06/2020
  • DocketCase assigned to Department 47 .

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less