This case was last updated from Sacramento County Superior Courts on 03/10/2019 at 08:42:35 (UTC).

Sidney Anne Crow vs. City of Sacramento

Case Summary

On 04/30/2018 Sidney Anne Crow filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against City of Sacramento. This case was filed in Sacramento County Superior Courts, Gordon D Schaber Sacramento County Courthouse located in Sacramento, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********2042

  • Filing Date:

    04/30/2018

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Sacramento, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Crow, Sidney Anne

Defendants

Romn Catholic Bishop of Sacramento

Does 1-100

City of Sacramento

Roman Catholic Bishop of Sacramento

Cross Defendant

Roes 1-50

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Christopher J Fry

Defendant Attorneys

Susana Alcala Wood

Stephen J Greene, Jr

 

Court Documents

Case Management Conference - Case Management Program scheduled for 11/08/2018 at 08:30:00 AM in Department 39 at Gordon D Schaber Courthouse and the Notice of Case Management Conference and Order to Appear has been generated .

Case Management Conference - Case Management Program scheduled for 11/08/2018 at 08:30:00 AM in Department 39 at Gordon D Schaber Courthouse and the Notice of Case Management Conference and Order to Appear has been generated .

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed.

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed. (Filed By: Crow, Sidney(Plaintiff))

Summons filed.

Summons filed. (Filed By: Crow, Sidney(Plaintiff))

Complaint filed.

Complaint filed. (Filed By: Crow, Sidney(Plaintiff))

Summons (to Cross-Complaint) filed.

Summons (to Cross-Complaint) filed. (Filed By: City of Sacramento(Cross - Complainant))

Cross-Complaint filed.

Cross-Complaint filed. (Filed By: City of Sacramento(Cross - Complainant))

Answer filed.

Answer filed. (Filed By: City of Sacramento(Defendant))

Answer filed.

Answer filed. (Filed By: Roman Catholic Bishop of Sacramento(Cross - Defendant))

Proof of Service filed.

Proof of Service filed. (Filed By: Crow, Sidney(Plaintiff))

Mediation Statement filed.

Mediation Statement filed. (Filed By: City of Sacramento(Defendant))

Case Management Statement filed.

Case Management Statement filed. (Filed By: City of Sacramento(Defendant))

Answer (to City of Sacramento Cross-Complaint) filed.

Answer (to City of Sacramento Cross-Complaint) filed. (Filed By: Roman Catholic Bishop of Sacramento(Cross - Defendant))

Case Management Statement filed.

Case Management Statement filed. (Filed By: Roman Catholic Bishop of Sacramento(Cross - Defendant))

Case Management Statement filed.

Case Management Statement filed. (Filed By: Crow, Sidney(Plaintiff))

Minutes finalized for Case Management Conference - Case Management Program heard on 11/08/2018 08:30:00 AM .

Minutes finalized for Case Management Conference - Case Management Program heard on 11/08/2018 08:30:00 AM .

Tentative Ruling for Case Management Conference - Case Management Program set on 11/08/2018 08:30:00 AM published .

Tentative Ruling for Case Management Conference - Case Management Program set on 11/08/2018 08:30:00 AM published .

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/08/2018
  • Past Hearings - Event Time: 8:30 AM; Event Type: Case Management Conference - Case Management Program; Department: 39; Status: Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Minutes finalized for Case Management Conference - Case Management Program heard on 11/08/2018 08:30:00 AM .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2018
  • Case Referred to Trial Setting process for parties' selection of Trial date and Mandatory Settlement Conference date no later than 60 days after the effective date.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2018
  • Case Referred to Trial Setting process for parties' selection of Trial date and Mandatory Settlement Conference date within 60 days of the referral date.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Tentative Ruling for Case Management Conference - Case Management Program set on 11/08/2018 08:30:00 AM published .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Management Statement filed. (Filed By: Crow, Sidney(Plaintiff))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Management Statement filed. (Filed By: Roman Catholic Bishop of Sacramento(Cross - Defendant))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Answer (to City of Sacramento Cross-Complaint) filed. (Filed By: Roman Catholic Bishop of Sacramento(Cross - Defendant))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Mediation Statement filed. (Filed By: City of Sacramento(Defendant))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Management Statement filed. (Filed By: City of Sacramento(Defendant))

    Read MoreRead Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 06/18/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Cross-Complaint filed. (Filed By: City of Sacramento(Cross - Complainant))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2018
  • Roes 1-50 added as a Cross - Defendant effective 06/18/2018 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Answer filed. (Filed By: City of Sacramento(Defendant))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2018
  • Wood, Susana Alcala added as a effective 06/18/2018 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Management Conference - Case Management Program scheduled for 11/08/2018 at 08:30:00 AM in Department 39 at Gordon D Schaber Courthouse and the Notice of Case Management Conference and Order to Appear has been generated .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2018
  • Case assigned to Department 39 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2018
  • Summons for 30-Day Summons was issued during case initiation on 05/01/2018 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet filed. (Filed By: Crow, Sidney(Plaintiff))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Summons filed. (Filed By: Crow, Sidney(Plaintiff))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Complaint filed. (Filed By: Crow, Sidney(Plaintiff))

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where THE ROMAN CATHOLIC BISHOP OF SACRAMENTO is a litigant

Latest cases where City of Sacramento is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Christopher J Fry