This case was last updated from Sacramento County Superior Courts on 09/11/2021 at 13:32:01 (UTC).

Sheldon Walker vs. Folsom Lake Ford Inc a California corporation

Case Summary

On 07/21/2021 Sheldon Walker filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against Folsom Lake Ford Inc a California corporation. This case was filed in Sacramento County Superior Courts, Gordon D Schaber Sacramento County Courthouse located in Sacramento, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********4667

  • Filing Date:

    07/21/2021

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • County, State:

    Sacramento, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

on behalf of himself and all aggrieved employees pursuant to Labor Code 2698 et seq

Walker, Sheldon

Defendants

Does 1 through 10

Folsom Lake Ford Inc a California corporation

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Alex P Katofsky

 

Court Documents

Summons filed.

Summons filed. (Filed By: Walker, Sheldon(Plaintiff); on behalf of himself and all aggrieved employees pursuant to Labor Code 2698 et seq(Plaintiff))

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed.

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed. (Filed By: Walker, Sheldon(Plaintiff); on behalf of himself and all aggrieved employees pursuant to Labor Code 2698 et seq(Plaintiff))

Complaint filed.

Complaint filed. (Filed By: Walker, Sheldon(Plaintiff); on behalf of himself and all aggrieved employees pursuant to Labor Code 2698 et seq(Plaintiff))

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed.

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed. (Filed By: Walker, Sheldon(Plaintiff))

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed.

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed. (Filed By: Walker, Sheldon(Plaintiff))

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed. (Filed By: Walker, Sheldon(Plaintiff))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed. (Filed By: Walker, Sheldon(Plaintiff))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2021
  • DocketThis case is reassigned from department 43 to department 38 for Case Management Program.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons filed. (Filed By: Walker, Sheldon(Plaintiff); on behalf of himself and all aggrieved employees pursuant to Labor Code 2698 et seq(Plaintiff))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint filed. (Filed By: Walker, Sheldon(Plaintiff); on behalf of himself and all aggrieved employees pursuant to Labor Code 2698 et seq(Plaintiff))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed. (Filed By: Walker, Sheldon(Plaintiff); on behalf of himself and all aggrieved employees pursuant to Labor Code 2698 et seq(Plaintiff))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2021
  • DocketCase assigned to Department 43 .

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Folsom Lake Ford Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where on behalf of himself and all members of the putative class is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer KATOFSKY ALEX