This case was last updated from Sacramento County Superior Courts on 05/30/2022 at 02:20:46 (UTC).

Scott Byrd vs. Tulsa Inspection Resources, LLC

Case Summary

On 03/08/2022 Scott Byrd filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against Tulsa Inspection Resources, LLC. This case was filed in Sacramento County Superior Courts, Gordon D Schaber Sacramento County Courthouse located in Sacramento, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********6536

  • Filing Date:

    03/08/2022

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • County, State:

    Sacramento, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Byrd, Scott

on Behalf of the State of California and Aggrieved Employees

Defendants

Cypress Environmental Management-TIR, LLC

Tulsa Inspection Resources, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

William M Hogg

 

Court Documents

Complaint filed

Complaint filed

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed

Order - Other (Delay in Scheduling Initial Case Management Conference) filed

Order - Other (Delay in Scheduling Initial Case Management Conference) filed

Summons submitted by Byrd, Scott rejected on 03/28/2022

Summons submitted by Byrd, Scott rejected on 03/28/2022

Summons submitted by Byrd, Scott rejected on 03/28/2022

Summons submitted by Byrd, Scott rejected on 03/28/2022

Summons filed

Summons filed

Summons filed

Summons filed

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed

Order - Other (Scheduling of Case Management Conference) filed

Order - Other (Scheduling of Case Management Conference) filed

Clerk's Certificate of Service By Mail (out of process) generated

Clerk's Certificate of Service By Mail (out of process) generated

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/26/2022
  • HearingEvent Type: Case Management Conference - Case Management Program; Department: 31; Status: Scheduled

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2022
  • DocketROA Entry: Notice of Removal to Federal Court filed; Filed By: Cypress Environmental Management-TIR, LLC(Defendant); Tulsa Inspection Resources, LLC(Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketROA Entry: Clerk's Certificate of Service By Mail (out of process) generated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2022
  • DocketROA Entry: Case Management Conference - Case Management Program scheduled for 08/26/2022 at 08:30:00 AM in Department 31 at Gordon D Schaber Courthouse and the Notice of Case Management Conference and Order to Appear has been generated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketROA Entry: Order - Other (Scheduling of Case Management Conference) filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketROA Entry: Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed; Filed By: Byrd, Scott(Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketROA Entry: Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed; Filed By: Byrd, Scott(Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketROA Entry: Summons filed; Filed By: Byrd, Scott(Plaintiff); on Behalf of the State of California and Aggrieved Employees(Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketROA Entry: Summons filed; Filed By: Byrd, Scott(Plaintiff); on Behalf of the State of California and Aggrieved Employees(Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketROA Entry: Summons submitted by Byrd, Scott rejected on 03/28/2022; Filed By: Byrd, Scott(Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketROA Entry: Summons submitted by Byrd, Scott rejected on 03/28/2022; Filed By: Byrd, Scott(Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketROA Entry: Order - Other (Delay in Scheduling Initial Case Management Conference) filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2022
  • DocketROA Entry: Case assigned to Department 31

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketROA Entry: Civil Case Cover Sheet filed; Filed By: Byrd, Scott(Plaintiff); on Behalf of the State of California and Aggrieved Employees(Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketROA Entry: Complaint filed; Filed By: Byrd, Scott(Plaintiff); on Behalf of the State of California and Aggrieved Employees(Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where on behalf of the State of California as a private attorney general is a litigant

Latest cases where Tulsa Inspection Resources, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where Cypress Environmental Management-TIR, LLC is a litigant