This case was last updated from Sacramento County Superior Courts on 12/12/2019 at 13:01:03 (UTC).

Samed Vardo vs. Avanyan Armen Kamoyevich

Case Summary

On 11/14/2019 Samed Vardo filed a Contract - Business lawsuit against Avanyan Armen Kamoyevich. This case was filed in Sacramento County Superior Courts, Gordon D Schaber Sacramento County Courthouse located in Sacramento, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********8997

  • Filing Date:

    11/14/2019

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Business

  • Court:

    Sacramento County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Gordon D Schaber Sacramento County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Sacramento, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Vardo, Samed

Defendants

Does 1-50

Kamoyevich, Avanyan Armen

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Michael R Quirk

 

Court Documents

Case Management Conference - Case Management Program scheduled for 05/14/2020 at 08:30:00 AM in Department 23 at Gordon D Schaber Courthouse and the Notice of Case Management Conference and Order to Appear has been generated .

Case Management Conference - Case Management Program scheduled for 05/14/2020 at 08:30:00 AM in Department 23 at Gordon D Schaber Courthouse and the Notice of Case Management Conference and Order to Appear has been generated .

Summons (on First Amended Complaint) filed.

Summons (on First Amended Complaint) filed. (Filed By: Vardo, Samed(Plaintiff))

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed.

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed. (Filed By: Vardo, Samed(Plaintiff))

Amended Complaint filed.

Amended Complaint filed. (Filed By: Vardo, Samed(Plaintiff))

Statement of Venue filed.

Statement of Venue filed. (Filed By: Vardo, Samed(Plaintiff))

Summons filed.

Summons filed. (Filed By: Vardo, Samed(Plaintiff))

Complaint filed.

Complaint filed. (Filed By: Vardo, Samed(Plaintiff))

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons (on First Amended Complaint) filed. (Filed By: Vardo, Samed(Plaintiff))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAmended Complaint filed. (Filed By: Vardo, Samed(Plaintiff))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2020
  • DocketGreat American Insurance Company added as a Defendant effective 12/19/2019 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2020
  • DocketLobel Financial Corporation added as a Defendant effective 12/19/2019 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatement of Venue filed. (Filed By: Vardo, Samed(Plaintiff))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Conference - Case Management Program scheduled for 05/14/2020 at 08:30:00 AM in Department 23 at Gordon D Schaber Courthouse and the Notice of Case Management Conference and Order to Appear has been generated .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2019
  • DocketCase assigned to Department 23 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2019
  • DocketSummons for 30-Day Summons was issued during case initiation on 11/15/2019 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed. (Filed By: Vardo, Samed(Plaintiff))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons filed. (Filed By: Vardo, Samed(Plaintiff))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint filed. (Filed By: Vardo, Samed(Plaintiff))

    Read MoreRead Less