This case was last updated from Not Yet Classified on 07/17/2023 at 23:57:01 (UTC).

Salvatore Ballew Faro vs. Brelsford Androvich & White, A Law Corporation

Case Summary

On 02/07/2023 Salvatore Ballew Faro filed a Not Yet Classified lawsuit against Brelsford Androvich White, A Law Corporation. This case was filed in Not Yet Classified, Not Yet Classified. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-GDS

  • Filing Date:

    02/07/2023

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Not Yet Classified

  • Courthouse:

    Not Yet Classified

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Faro, Salvatore Ballew

Defendants

White, A Law Corporation

Raymond Parker White

William L. Brelsford Jr. Erroneously Sued As William L. Brelsford

Not Classified By Court

Pamela Beth Shafer

 

Court Documents

Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information

05/31/2023; Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

05/02/2023; Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Answer

05/02/2023; Answer

Proof of Service by Mail

04/04/2023; Proof of Service by Mail

Amended Complaint First

04/04/2023; Amended Complaint First

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

03/08/2023; Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

03/08/2023; Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

02/17/2023; Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Summons

02/08/2023; Summons

Notice of Case Assignment and Case Management Conference

02/08/2023; Notice of Case Assignment and Case Management Conference

Civil Case Cover Sheet

02/07/2023; Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint

02/07/2023; Complaint

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/06/2023
  • DocketMessage: Address for Pamela Beth Shafer (Attorney) updated; Category: Party

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/06/2023
  • DocketMessage: Updated -- Pamela Beth Shafer (Attorney):Organization Name changed from Rankin Shuey Ranucci Mintz Lampasona & Reynolds to Rankin Shuey Ranucci Mintz Lampasona & Harper; Category: Party

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/06/2023
  • DocketMessage: Address for Pamela Beth Shafer (Attorney) updated; Category: Party

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/31/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketName: Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information; Filed By: Pamela Beth Shafer (Attorney)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/31/2023
  • DocketMessage: Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information Filed by: Pamela Beth Shafer (Attorney); Category: Document

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/02/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketName: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed By: Brelsford Androvich & White, A Law Corporation (Defendant); Raymond Parker White (Defendant); William L. Brelsford Jr. Erroneously Sued As William L. Brelsford (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/02/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketName: Answer; Filed By: Brelsford Androvich & White, A Law Corporation (Defendant); Raymond Parker White (Defendant); William L. Brelsford Jr. Erroneously Sued As William L. Brelsford (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/02/2023
  • DocketMessage: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees Filed by: Brelsford Androvich & White, A Law Corporation (Defendant); Raymond Parker White (Defendant); William L. Brelsford Jr. Erroneously Sued As William L. Brelsford (Defendant); Category: Document

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/02/2023
  • DocketMessage: Answer Filed by: Brelsford Androvich & White, A Law Corporation (Defendant); Raymond Parker White (Defendant); William L. Brelsford Jr. Erroneously Sued As William L. Brelsford (Defendant); Category: Document

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/04/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketName: Proof of Service by Mail; Filed By: Faro, Salvatore Ballew (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
11 More Docket Entries
  • 02/08/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketName: Summons; Filed By: Faro, Salvatore Ballew (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/08/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketName: Notice of Case Assignment and Case Management Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/08/2023
  • DocketName: RECEIPT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/08/2023
  • DocketMessage: Summons for 30-Day Summons was issued during case initiation on 02/08/2023 .; Category: Case

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/08/2023
  • DocketMessage: Summons filed. Filed By: Faro, Salvatore Ballew (Plaintiff); Category: Document

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/07/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketName: Civil Case Cover Sheet; Filed By: Faro, Salvatore Ballew (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/07/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketName: Complaint; Filed By: Faro, Salvatore Ballew (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/07/2023
  • DocketMessage: Civil Case Cover Sheet filed. Filed By: Faro, Salvatore Ballew (Plaintiff); Category: Document

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/07/2023
  • DocketMessage: Complaint filed. Filed By: Faro, Salvatore Ballew (Plaintiff); Category: Document

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/07/2023
  • DocketMessage: Case assigned to Department 38 .; Category: Case

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less