This case was last updated from Sacramento County Superior Courts on 03/15/2022 at 19:31:16 (UTC).

Roniel Singh vs. Sutter Valley Hospitals

Case Summary

On 05/04/2021 Roniel Singh filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against Sutter Valley Hospitals. This case was filed in Sacramento County Superior Courts, Gordon D Schaber Sacramento County Courthouse located in Sacramento, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0028

  • Filing Date:

    05/04/2021

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • County, State:

    Sacramento, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Singh, Roniel

Defendant

Sutter Valley Hospitals

Not Classified By Court

Does 1-50

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Norman Blumenthal

Defendant Attorney

Teresa W Ghali

 

Court Documents

Order - Other (Delay in Scheduling Initial Case Management Conference) filed.

Order - Other (Delay in Scheduling Initial Case Management Conference) filed.

Summons filed.

Summons filed. (Filed By: Singh, Roniel(Plaintiff))

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed.

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed. (Filed By: Singh, Roniel(Plaintiff))

Complaint filed.

Complaint filed. (Filed By: Singh, Roniel(Plaintiff))

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed

Proof of Service of 30 day Summons & Complaint - Notice of Acknowledgment of Receipt filed

Proof of Service of 30 day Summons & Complaint - Notice of Acknowledgment of Receipt filed

Answer filed

Answer filed

Order - Other (Scheduling of Case Management Conference) filed

Order - Other (Scheduling of Case Management Conference) filed

Clerk's Certificate of Service By Mail (out of process) generated

Clerk's Certificate of Service By Mail (out of process) generated

Case Management Statement filed

Case Management Statement filed

Notice of Remote Appearance filed

Notice of Remote Appearance filed

Tentative Ruling for Case Management Conference - Case Management Program set on 03/18/2022 08:30:00 AM published

Tentative Ruling for Case Management Conference - Case Management Program set on 03/18/2022 08:30:00 AM published

Case Management Statement filed

Case Management Statement filed

Notice of Remote Appearance filed

Notice of Remote Appearance filed

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/18/2022
  • HearingEvent Type: Case Management Conference - Case Management Program; Department: 31; Status: Scheduled

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketROA Entry: Tentative Ruling for Case Management Conference - Case Management Program set on 03/18/2022 08:30:00 AM published

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketROA Entry: Notice of Remote Appearance filed; Filed By: Sutter Valley Hospitals(Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketROA Entry: Case Management Statement filed; Filed By: Sutter Valley Hospitals(Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketROA Entry: Notice of Remote Appearance filed; Filed By: Singh, Roniel(Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketROA Entry: Case Management Statement filed; Filed By: Singh, Roniel(Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketROA Entry: Clerk's Certificate of Service By Mail (out of process) generated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketROA Entry: Order - Other (Scheduling of Case Management Conference) filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2022
  • DocketROA Entry: Case Management Conference - Case Management Program scheduled for 03/18/2022 at 08:30:00 AM in Department 31 at Gordon D Schaber Courthouse and the Notice of Case Management Conference and Order to Appear has been generated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2021
  • DocketROA Entry: Ghali, Teresa W added as a effective 10/18/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketROA Entry: Answer filed; Filed By: Sutter Valley Hospitals(Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketROA Entry: Proof of Service of 30 day Summons & Complaint - Notice of Acknowledgment of Receipt filed; Filed By: Singh, Roniel(Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2021
  • DocketROA Entry: Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed; Filed By: Singh, Roniel(Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketROA Entry: Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed; Filed By: Singh, Roniel(Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketROA Entry: Summons filed; Filed By: Singh, Roniel(Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2021
  • DocketROA Entry: Case assigned to Department 31

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketROA Entry: Order - Other (Delay in Scheduling Initial Case Management Conference) filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketROA Entry: Civil Case Cover Sheet filed; Filed By: Singh, Roniel(Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketROA Entry: Complaint filed; Filed By: Singh, Roniel(Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Sutter Valley Hospitals is a litigant