This case was last updated from Sacramento County Superior Courts on 12/04/2018 at 13:45:11 (UTC).

Roman Catholic Bishop of Sacramento vs. William DePrato

Case Summary

On 05/17/2018 Roman Catholic Bishop of Sacramento filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against William DePrato. This case was filed in Sacramento County Superior Courts, Gordon D Schaber Sacramento County Courthouse located in Sacramento, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********3281

  • Filing Date:

    05/17/2018

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Sacramento, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Roman Catholic Bishop of Sacramento

St. Francis Catholic High School

Defendants

DePrato, William

Does 1-20

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Jennifer H Sanden

Defendant Attorney

Karen L Jacobsen

 

Court Documents

Case Management Conference - Case Management Program scheduled for 11/29/2018 at 08:30:00 AM in Department 23 at Gordon D Schaber Courthouse and the Notice of Case Management Conference and Order to Appear has been generated .

Case Management Conference - Case Management Program scheduled for 11/29/2018 at 08:30:00 AM in Department 23 at Gordon D Schaber Courthouse and the Notice of Case Management Conference and Order to Appear has been generated .

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed.

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed. (Filed By: Roman Catholic Bishop of Sacramento(Plaintiff))

Summons filed.

Summons filed. (Filed By: Roman Catholic Bishop of Sacramento(Plaintiff))

Complaint filed.

Complaint filed. (Filed By: Roman Catholic Bishop of Sacramento(Plaintiff))

Notice - Other (Notice that thrid party action has been commenced.) filed.

Notice - Other (Notice that thrid party action has been commenced.) filed. (Filed By: Roman Catholic Bishop of Sacramento(Plaintiff))

Summons (First Amended) filed.

Summons (First Amended) filed. (Filed By: Roman Catholic Bishop of Sacramento(Plaintiff); St. Francis Catholic High School(Plaintiff))

Amended Complaint (First Amended) filed.

Amended Complaint (First Amended) filed. (Filed By: Roman Catholic Bishop of Sacramento(Plaintiff); St. Francis Catholic High School(Plaintiff))

Answer (to First Amended Complaint) filed.

Answer (to First Amended Complaint) filed. (Filed By: DePrato, William(Defendant))

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed.

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed. (Filed By: Roman Catholic Bishop of Sacramento(Plaintiff); St. Francis Catholic High School(Plaintiff))

Minutes finalized for Case Management Conference - Case Management Program heard on 11/29/2018 08:30:00 AM .

Minutes finalized for Case Management Conference - Case Management Program heard on 11/29/2018 08:30:00 AM .

Tentative Ruling for Case Management Conference - Case Management Program set on 11/29/2018 08:30:00 AM published .

Tentative Ruling for Case Management Conference - Case Management Program set on 11/29/2018 08:30:00 AM published .

Proof of Service - MAILING filed.

Proof of Service - MAILING filed. (Filed By: Roman Catholic Bishop of Sacramento(Plaintiff); St. Francis Catholic High School(Plaintiff))

Notice of Intent to Appear Telephonically filed.

Notice of Intent to Appear Telephonically filed. (Filed By: Roman Catholic Bishop of Sacramento(Plaintiff); St. Francis Catholic High School(Plaintiff))

Case Management Statement filed.

Case Management Statement filed. (Filed By: Roman Catholic Bishop of Sacramento(Plaintiff); St. Francis Catholic High School(Plaintiff))

Case Management Statement filed.

Case Management Statement filed. (Filed By: DePrato, William(Defendant))

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/29/2018
  • Past Hearings - Event Time: 8:30 AM; Event Type: Case Management Conference - Case Management Program; Department: 23; Status: Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Minutes finalized for Case Management Conference - Case Management Program heard on 11/29/2018 08:30:00 AM .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2018
  • Case Referred to Trial Setting process for parties' selection of Trial date and Mandatory Settlement Conference date no later than 60 days after the effective date.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2018
  • Case Referred to Trial Setting process for parties' selection of Trial date and Mandatory Settlement Conference date within 60 days of the referral date.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Tentative Ruling for Case Management Conference - Case Management Program set on 11/29/2018 08:30:00 AM published .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Proof of Service - MAILING filed. (Filed By: Roman Catholic Bishop of Sacramento(Plaintiff); St. Francis Catholic High School(Plaintiff))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Intent to Appear Telephonically filed. (Filed By: Roman Catholic Bishop of Sacramento(Plaintiff); St. Francis Catholic High School(Plaintiff))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Management Statement filed. (Filed By: Roman Catholic Bishop of Sacramento(Plaintiff); St. Francis Catholic High School(Plaintiff))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Management Statement filed. (Filed By: DePrato, William(Defendant))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Answer (to First Amended Complaint) filed. (Filed By: DePrato, William(Defendant))

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 06/01/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Summons (First Amended) filed. (Filed By: Roman Catholic Bishop of Sacramento(Plaintiff); St. Francis Catholic High School(Plaintiff))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Amended Complaint (First Amended) filed. (Filed By: Roman Catholic Bishop of Sacramento(Plaintiff); St. Francis Catholic High School(Plaintiff))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2018
  • St. Francis Catholic High School added as a Plaintiff effective 06/01/2018 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice - Other (Notice that thrid party action has been commenced.) filed. (Filed By: Roman Catholic Bishop of Sacramento(Plaintiff))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Management Conference - Case Management Program scheduled for 11/29/2018 at 08:30:00 AM in Department 23 at Gordon D Schaber Courthouse and the Notice of Case Management Conference and Order to Appear has been generated .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2018
  • Case assigned to Department 23 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2018
  • Summons for 30-Day Summons was issued during case initiation on 05/18/2018 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet filed. (Filed By: Roman Catholic Bishop of Sacramento(Plaintiff))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Summons filed. (Filed By: Roman Catholic Bishop of Sacramento(Plaintiff))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Complaint filed. (Filed By: Roman Catholic Bishop of Sacramento(Plaintiff))

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where THE ROMAN CATHOLIC BISHOP OF SACRAMENTO is a litigant