This case was last updated from Sacramento County Superior Courts on 02/13/2021 at 16:44:47 (UTC).

Robert Chandler vs. Unemployment Insurance Appeals Board

Case Summary

On 11/17/2020 Robert Chandler filed an Other - Writ Of Mandamus lawsuit against Unemployment Insurance Appeals Board. This case was filed in Sacramento County Superior Courts, Gordon D Schaber Sacramento County Courthouse located in Sacramento, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********3533

  • Filing Date:

    11/17/2020

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Other - Writ Of Mandamus

  • County, State:

    Sacramento, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Chandler, Robert

Respondents

Unemployment Insurance Appeals Board

Watts Labor Community Action Committee

 

Court Documents

Case initiation form printed .

Case initiation form printed .

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed.

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed. (Filed By: Chandler, Robert(Petitioner))

Petition for Writ of Mandate filed.

Petition for Writ of Mandate filed. (Filed By: Chandler, Robert(Petitioner))

Order on Court Fee Waiver (FW-003) filed.

Order on Court Fee Waiver (FW-003) filed.

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/23/2021
  • HearingEvent Type: Petition for Writ of Mandate - Writ of Mandate; Department: 27; Status: Scheduled

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2020
  • DocketPetition for Writ of Mandate - Writ of Mandate scheduled for 04/23/2021 at 02:00:00 PM in Department 27 at Gordon D Schaber Courthouse .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2020
  • DocketChandler, Robert Application for Waiver granted in full on 11/19/2020 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder on Court Fee Waiver (FW-003) filed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase initiation form printed .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPetition for Writ of Mandate filed. (Filed By: Chandler, Robert(Petitioner))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed. (Filed By: Chandler, Robert(Petitioner))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2020
  • DocketCase assigned to Department 27 .

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where WATTS LABOR COMMUNITY ACTION COMMITTEE is a litigant