This case was last updated from Sacramento County Superior Courts on 01/06/2023 at 22:06:50 (UTC).

Regional Builders Inc vs. Ricky Y Wong

Case Summary

On 02/04/2022 Regional Builders Inc filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Ricky Y Wong. This case was filed in Sacramento County Superior Courts, Gordon D Schaber Sacramento County Courthouse located in Sacramento, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********5805

  • Filing Date:

    02/04/2022

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Sacramento, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Regional Builders Inc

Defendants

Does 1-50

Ricky Y Wong and Hiufun Lina Wong as trustees

Stearns Lending LLC

Wong, Hiufun Lina

Wong, Ricky Y.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Richard D Sopp

 

Court Documents

Complaint filed

Complaint filed

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed

Summons filed

Summons filed

Request for Dismissal filed

Request for Dismissal filed

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/26/2022
  • DocketROA Entry: Complaint disposed with disposition of Request for Dismissal

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/28/2022
  • DocketROA Entry: Case disposed with disposition of Request for Dismissal

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/28/2022
  • DocketROA Entry: Case dismissed with disposition of Request for Dismissal

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketROA Entry: Request for Dismissal filed; Filed By: Regional Builders Inc(Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketROA Entry: Summons filed; Filed By: Regional Builders Inc(Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketROA Entry: Civil Case Cover Sheet filed; Filed By: Regional Builders Inc(Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketROA Entry: Complaint filed; Filed By: Regional Builders Inc(Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less