This case was last updated from Sacramento County Superior Courts on 12/13/2021 at 13:30:40 (UTC).

Randall Kunsman vs. Patriot Environmental Services

Case Summary

On 10/22/2021 Randall Kunsman filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against Patriot Environmental Services. This case was filed in Sacramento County Superior Courts, Gordon D Schaber Sacramento County Courthouse located in Sacramento, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0042

  • Filing Date:

    10/22/2021

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • County, State:

    Sacramento, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

and all 'aggrieved employees' pursuant to Labor Code 2698 et seq.

Kunsman, Randall

Defendants

Does 1-10

Patriot Environmental Services

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Alex P Katofsky

 

Court Documents

Order - Other (Delay in Scheduling Initial Case Management Conference) filed.

Order - Other (Delay in Scheduling Initial Case Management Conference) filed.

Summons filed.

Summons filed. (Filed By: Kunsman, Randall(Plaintiff); and all 'aggrieved employees' pursuant to Labor Code 2698 et seq.(Plaintiff))

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed.

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed. (Filed By: Kunsman, Randall(Plaintiff); and all 'aggrieved employees' pursuant to Labor Code 2698 et seq.(Plaintiff))

Complaint filed.

Complaint filed. (Filed By: Kunsman, Randall(Plaintiff); and all 'aggrieved employees' pursuant to Labor Code 2698 et seq.(Plaintiff))

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute filed.

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute filed. (Filed By: Kunsman, Randall(Plaintiff))

Proof of Service of 30 day Summons & Complaint - Notice of Acknowledgment of Receipt filed.

Proof of Service of 30 day Summons & Complaint - Notice of Acknowledgment of Receipt filed. (Filed By: Kunsman, Randall(Plaintiff))

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service of 30 day Summons & Complaint - Notice of Acknowledgment of Receipt filed. (Filed By: Kunsman, Randall(Plaintiff))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute filed. (Filed By: Kunsman, Randall(Plaintiff))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons filed. (Filed By: Kunsman, Randall(Plaintiff); and all 'aggrieved employees' pursuant to Labor Code 2698 et seq.(Plaintiff))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint filed. (Filed By: Kunsman, Randall(Plaintiff); and all 'aggrieved employees' pursuant to Labor Code 2698 et seq.(Plaintiff))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed. (Filed By: Kunsman, Randall(Plaintiff); and all 'aggrieved employees' pursuant to Labor Code 2698 et seq.(Plaintiff))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2021
  • DocketCase assigned to Department 31 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder - Other (Delay in Scheduling Initial Case Management Conference) filed.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where PATRIOT ENVIRONMENTAL SERVICES INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer KATOFSKY ALEX