This case was last updated from Sacramento County Superior Courts on 12/12/2019 at 13:01:15 (UTC).

Railroad 1955 LLC a Delaware limited lability company vs. Future Agricultural Holdings LLC

Case Summary

On 11/14/2019 Railroad 1955 LLC a Delaware limited lability company filed a Property - Commercial Eviction lawsuit against Future Agricultural Holdings LLC. This case was filed in Sacramento County Superior Courts, Gordon D Schaber Sacramento County Courthouse located in Sacramento, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********9121

  • Filing Date:

    11/14/2019

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Property - Commercial Eviction

  • Court:

    Sacramento County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Gordon D Schaber Sacramento County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Sacramento, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Railroad 1955 LLC a Delaware limited lability company

Defendants

Does 1-10

Future Agricultural Holdings LLC

Railroad 1 Enterprises LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Ernie Zachary Park

 

Court Documents

Proof of Service of 5-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed.

Proof of Service of 5-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed. (Filed By: Railroad 1955 LLC a Delaware limited lability company(Plaintiff))

Case Management Conference - Case Management Program scheduled for 05/21/2020 at 08:30:00 AM in Department 23 at Gordon D Schaber Courthouse and the Notice of Case Management Conference and Order to Appear has been generated .

Case Management Conference - Case Management Program scheduled for 05/21/2020 at 08:30:00 AM in Department 23 at Gordon D Schaber Courthouse and the Notice of Case Management Conference and Order to Appear has been generated .

Proof of Service of 5-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed.

Proof of Service of 5-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed. (Filed By: Railroad 1955 LLC a Delaware limited lability company(Plaintiff))

Declaration - Other (ISO Application for Default Judgment) submitted by Railroad 1955 LLC a Delaware limited lability company rejected on 12/13/2019 .

Declaration - Other (ISO Application for Default Judgment) submitted by Railroad 1955 LLC a Delaware limited lability company rejected on 12/13/2019 . (Filed By: Railroad 1955 LLC a Delaware limited lability company(Plaintiff))

Summons filed.

Summons filed. (Filed By: Railroad 1955 LLC a Delaware limited lability company(Plaintiff))

Complaint filed.

Complaint filed. (Filed By: Railroad 1955 LLC a Delaware limited lability company(Plaintiff))

Notice to Pay or Quit filed.

Notice to Pay or Quit filed. (Filed By: Railroad 1955 LLC a Delaware limited lability company(Plaintiff))

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed.

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed. (Filed By: Railroad 1955 LLC a Delaware limited lability company(Plaintiff))

Answer filed.

Answer filed. (Filed By: Future Agricultural Holdings LLC(Defendant))

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDeclaration - Other (ISO Application for Default Judgment) submitted by Railroad 1955 LLC a Delaware limited lability company rejected on 12/13/2019 . (Filed By: Railroad 1955 LLC a Delaware limited lability company(Plaintiff))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice to Pay or Quit filed. (Filed By: Railroad 1955 LLC a Delaware limited lability company(Plaintiff))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service of 5-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed. (Filed By: Railroad 1955 LLC a Delaware limited lability company(Plaintiff))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service of 5-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed. (Filed By: Railroad 1955 LLC a Delaware limited lability company(Plaintiff))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAnswer filed. (Filed By: Future Agricultural Holdings LLC(Defendant))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Conference - Case Management Program scheduled for 05/21/2020 at 08:30:00 AM in Department 23 at Gordon D Schaber Courthouse and the Notice of Case Management Conference and Order to Appear has been generated .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2019
  • DocketCase assigned to Department 23 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2019
  • DocketSummons for 5-Day Summons was issued during case initiation on 11/18/2019 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons filed. (Filed By: Railroad 1955 LLC a Delaware limited lability company(Plaintiff))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed. (Filed By: Railroad 1955 LLC a Delaware limited lability company(Plaintiff))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint filed. (Filed By: Railroad 1955 LLC a Delaware limited lability company(Plaintiff))

    Read MoreRead Less