Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Sacramento County Superior Courts on 05/29/2019 at 13:42:25 (UTC).

Public Employment Relations Board vs. American Federation of State County and Municipal Employees Local 3299

Case Summary

On 03/15/2019 Public Employment Relations Board filed an Other lawsuit against American Federation of State County and Municipal Employees Local 3299. This case was filed in Sacramento County Superior Courts, Gordon D Schaber Sacramento County Courthouse located in Sacramento, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********2508

  • Filing Date:

    03/15/2019

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Sacramento County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Gordon D Schaber Sacramento County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Sacramento, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Public Employment Relations Board

Defendants

American Federation of State County and Municipal Employees Local 3299

University Professional and Technical Employees CWA Local 9119

Interested Party

Regents of the University of California

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

J Felix De La Torre

Defendant Attorney

Kate Hallward

Interested Party Attorneys

Allison M Woodall

Timothy G Yeung

 

Court Documents

Notice of Entry of Order filed.

Notice of Entry of Order filed. (Filed By: Public Employment Relations Board(Plaintiff))

Order After Hearing (Granting Preliminary Injunction) filed.

Order After Hearing (Granting Preliminary Injunction) filed.

Reply (Brief RE: Preliminary Injunction) filed.

Reply (Brief RE: Preliminary Injunction) filed. (Filed By: Public Employment Relations Board(Plaintiff))

Declaration - Other (J. Felix De La Torre ISO Reply Brief RE: Preliminary Injunction) filed.

Declaration - Other (J. Felix De La Torre ISO Reply Brief RE: Preliminary Injunction) filed. (Filed By: Public Employment Relations Board(Plaintiff))

Paper Exhibits (to Declaration of J Felix De La Torre ISO Reply Brief RE: Preliminary Injunction) filed.

Paper Exhibits (to Declaration of J Felix De La Torre ISO Reply Brief RE: Preliminary Injunction) filed. (Filed By: Public Employment Relations Board(Plaintiff))

Opposition (to Motion to Intervene) filed.

Opposition (to Motion to Intervene) filed. (Filed By: American Federation of State County and Municipal Employees Local 3299(Defendant); University Professional and Technical Employees CWA Local 9119(Defendant))

Declaration - Other (Index of Evidence of Submitted by Opposition) filed.

Declaration - Other (Index of Evidence of Submitted by Opposition) filed. (Filed By: American Federation of State County and Municipal Employees Local 3299(Defendant); University Professional and Technical Employees CWA Local 9119(Defendant))

Proposed Order (Denying Motion to Intervene) filed.

Proposed Order (Denying Motion to Intervene) filed. (Filed By: American Federation of State County and Municipal Employees Local 3299(Defendant); University Professional and Technical Employees CWA Local 9119(Defendant))

Declaration - Other (of Ziaja) filed.

Declaration - Other (of Ziaja) filed. (Filed By: American Federation of State County and Municipal Employees Local 3299(Defendant); University Professional and Technical Employees CWA Local 9119(Defendant))

Declaration - Other (of Schwartz Vol 7 Ex 9-14) filed.

Declaration - Other (of Schwartz Vol 7 Ex 9-14) filed. (Filed By: American Federation of State County and Municipal Employees Local 3299(Defendant); University Professional and Technical Employees CWA Local 9119(Defendant))

Summons filed.

Summons filed. (Filed By: Public Employment Relations Board(Plaintiff))

Ex Parte Application - Other filed.

Ex Parte Application - Other filed. (Filed By: Public Employment Relations Board(Plaintiff))

Exhibit List (Volume V of VI Exhibits Exhibits J-O) filed.

Exhibit List (Volume V of VI Exhibits Exhibits J-O) filed. (Filed By: Public Employment Relations Board(Plaintiff))

Paper Exhibits (Volume II of VI Exhibits F) filed.

Paper Exhibits (Volume II of VI Exhibits F) filed. (Filed By: Public Employment Relations Board(Plaintiff))

Declaration - Other (Index of Evidence) filed.

Declaration - Other (Index of Evidence) filed. (Filed By: American Federation of State County and Municipal Employees Local 3299(Defendant); University Professional and Technical Employees CWA Local 9119(Defendant))

Memorandum of Points and Authorities (in Oppo to App for TRO) filed.

Memorandum of Points and Authorities (in Oppo to App for TRO) filed. (Filed By: American Federation of State County and Municipal Employees Local 3299(Defendant); University Professional and Technical Employees CWA Local 9119(Defendant))

Order Determining Disposition of Ex Parte Application filed.

Order Determining Disposition of Ex Parte Application filed.

Case Management Conference - Case Management Program scheduled for 09/12/2019 at 08:30:00 AM in Department 39 at Gordon D Schaber Courthouse and the Notice of Case Management Conference and Order to Appear has been generated .

Case Management Conference - Case Management Program scheduled for 09/12/2019 at 08:30:00 AM in Department 39 at Gordon D Schaber Courthouse and the Notice of Case Management Conference and Order to Appear has been generated .

55 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/02/2019
  • Past Hearings - Event Time: 9:00 AM; Event Type: Motion - Other - Civil Law and Motion; Department: 54; Status: Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2019
  • Past Hearings - Event Time: 9:00 AM; Event Type: Motion for Preliminary Injunction; Department: 54; Status: Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Entry of Order filed. (Filed By: Public Employment Relations Board(Plaintiff))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Order After Hearing (Granting Preliminary Injunction) filed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Minutes finalized for Motion for Preliminary Injunction heard on 05/02/2019 09:00:00 AM .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Minutes finalized for Motion - Other - Civil Law and Motion heard on 05/02/2019 09:00:00 AM .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Minutes finalized for Motion - Other - Civil Law and Motion heard on 04/19/2019 09:30:00 AM .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Minutes finalized for Motion - Other - Civil Law and Motion heard on 04/19/2019 09:00:00 AM .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2019
  • Motion - Other - Civil Law and Motion continued to 05/02/2019 at 09:00 in this department.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2019
  • Motion - Other - Civil Law and Motion scheduled for 05/02/2019 at 09:00:00 AM in Department 54 at Gordon D Schaber Courthouse .

    Read MoreRead Less
64 More Docket Entries
  • 03/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Declaration - Other (of Timothy G Yeung ISO Ex Parte for TRO/OSC RE Preliminary Injunction) filed. (Filed By: Regents of the University of California(Real Party In Interest (Rpii)))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Trial Brief (ISO Ex Parte for TRO/OSC RE Preliminary Injunction) filed. (Filed By: Regents of the University of California(Real Party In Interest (Rpii)))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Ex Parte Application - Other (for TRO/OSC RE Preliminary Injunction) filed. (Filed By: Regents of the University of California(Real Party In Interest (Rpii)))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Management Conference - Case Management Program scheduled for 09/12/2019 at 08:30:00 AM in Department 39 at Gordon D Schaber Courthouse and the Notice of Case Management Conference and Order to Appear has been generated .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2019
  • Case assigned to Department 39 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2019
  • Summons for 30-Day Summons was issued during case initiation on 03/15/2019 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Related Case filed. (Filed By: Public Employment Relations Board(Plaintiff))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet filed. (Filed By: Public Employment Relations Board(Plaintiff))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Summons filed. (Filed By: Public Employment Relations Board(Plaintiff))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Complaint filed. (Filed By: Public Employment Relations Board(Plaintiff))

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where American Federation Of State, County, And Municipal Employees Local 3299 is a litigant

Latest cases where THE REGENTS OF THE UNIVERSITY OF CALIFORNIA A PUBLIC ENTITY is a litigant