This case was last updated from Sacramento County Superior Courts on 02/11/2021 at 05:55:28 (UTC).

Platinum Specialty Services, Inc. vs. Travelers Casualty And Surety Company Of America

Case Summary

On 08/28/2020 Platinum Specialty Services, Inc filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against Travelers Casualty And Surety Company Of America. This case was filed in Sacramento County Superior Courts, Gordon D Schaber Sacramento County Courthouse located in Sacramento, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********4758

  • Filing Date:

    08/28/2020

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Sacramento, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Platinum Specialty Services, Inc.

Defendants

TNT Industrial Contractors, Inc.

Does 1-500

Travelers Casualty And Surety Company Of America

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Bryce D Carroll

 

Court Documents

Order - Other (Delay in Scheduling Initial Case Management Conference) filed.

Order - Other (Delay in Scheduling Initial Case Management Conference) filed.

Summons filed.

Summons filed. (Filed By: Platinum Specialty Services, Inc.(Plaintiff))

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed.

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed. (Filed By: Platinum Specialty Services, Inc.(Plaintiff))

Complaint filed.

Complaint filed. (Filed By: Platinum Specialty Services, Inc.(Plaintiff))

Request for Dismissal filed.

Request for Dismissal filed. (Filed By: Platinum Specialty Services, Inc.(Plaintiff))

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute filed.

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute filed. (Filed By: Platinum Specialty Services, Inc.(Plaintiff))

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed.

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed. (Filed By: Platinum Specialty Services, Inc.(Plaintiff))

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/15/2021
  • DocketComplaint disposed with disposition of Request for Dismissal .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal filed. (Filed By: Platinum Specialty Services, Inc.(Plaintiff))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2020
  • DocketCase dismissed with disposition of Request for Dismissal .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2020
  • DocketCase disposed with disposition of Request for Dismissal .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed. (Filed By: Platinum Specialty Services, Inc.(Plaintiff))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute filed. (Filed By: Platinum Specialty Services, Inc.(Plaintiff))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons filed. (Filed By: Platinum Specialty Services, Inc.(Plaintiff))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2020
  • DocketSummons for 30-Day Summons was issued during case initiation on 09/15/2020 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint filed. (Filed By: Platinum Specialty Services, Inc.(Plaintiff))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed. (Filed By: Platinum Specialty Services, Inc.(Plaintiff))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder - Other (Delay in Scheduling Initial Case Management Conference) filed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2020
  • DocketCase assigned to Department 31 .

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where PLATINUM SPECIALTY SERVICES INC is a litigant

Latest cases where TRAVELERS CASUALTY & SURETY COMPANY OF AMERICA is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer CARROLL, BRYCE D.