This case was last updated from Sacramento County Superior Courts on 08/31/2022 at 18:54:23 (UTC).

Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company vs. Royce International Broadcasting Corporation

Case Summary

On 07/15/2019 Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Royce International Broadcasting Corporation. This case was filed in Sacramento County Superior Courts, Gordon D Schaber Sacramento County Courthouse located in Sacramento, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0594

  • Filing Date:

    07/15/2019

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Sacramento, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company

Defendants

Does 1-10

Edward Stolz as Successor Trustee of the Dominic Rose Trust UDT April 27 2007

Golden State Broadcasting LLC

Silver State Broadcasting LLC

Royce International Broadcasting Corporation

Stolz, Edward

McKay, Debby

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Carlos E Sosa

Defendant Attorney

John S Sargetis

 

Court Documents

Tentative Ruling for Case Management Conference - Case Management Program set on 01/16/2020 08:30:00 AM published

Tentative Ruling for Case Management Conference - Case Management Program set on 01/16/2020 08:30:00 AM published

Notice of Stay of Proceedings filed

Notice of Stay of Proceedings filed

Reply (re MSJ and request for court scheduled status conference) filed

Reply (re MSJ and request for court scheduled status conference) filed

Minutes finalized for Motion for Summary Judgment and/or Adjudication - Civil Law and Motion - MSA/MSJ/SLAPP heard on 05/12/2022 09:00:00 AM

Minutes finalized for Motion for Summary Judgment and/or Adjudication - Civil Law and Motion - MSA/MSJ/SLAPP heard on 05/12/2022 09:00:00 AM

Opposition (to MSJ/SA) filed

Opposition (to MSJ/SA) filed

Request - Other (to Cont. MSC) filed

Request - Other (to Cont. MSC) filed

Paper Exhibits (Evidence ISO MSJ) filed

Paper Exhibits (Evidence ISO MSJ) filed

Statement - Other (Separate Statement of Material Facts and Supporting Evidence ISO MSJ/SA) filed

Statement - Other (Separate Statement of Material Facts and Supporting Evidence ISO MSJ/SA) filed

Motion for Summary Judgment and/or Adjudication filed

Motion for Summary Judgment and/or Adjudication filed

Notice of Settlement Conference and Trial Dates filed

Notice of Settlement Conference and Trial Dates filed

Clerk's Certificate of Service By Mail (Minute Order) generated

Clerk's Certificate of Service By Mail (Minute Order) generated

Minutes finalized for heard on 05/28/2021 09:00:00 AM

Minutes finalized for heard on 05/28/2021 09:00:00 AM

Notice - Other (of Ruling on Motion to Compel) filed

Notice - Other (of Ruling on Motion to Compel) filed

Minutes finalized for Motion to Compel - Other - Civil Law and Motion heard on 12/15/2020 09:00:00 AM

Minutes finalized for Motion to Compel - Other - Civil Law and Motion heard on 12/15/2020 09:00:00 AM

Reply (in Support of Motion to Compel) filed

Reply (in Support of Motion to Compel) filed

Non-Opposition (Defendant Golden State Broadcasting LLC Non-Opposition to Plaintiff's Second Set ofSpecial Interrogatories and Request for sanctions;Opposition only for sanctions) filed

Non-Opposition (Defendant Golden State Broadcasting LLC Non-Opposition to Plaintiff's Second Set ofSpecial Interrogatories and Request for sanctions;Opposition only for sanctions) filed

Motion to Compel - Other (Further Responses to Second Set of Special Interrogs) filed

Motion to Compel - Other (Further Responses to Second Set of Special Interrogs) filed

Statement - Other (Sep Statement iso MTC) filed

Statement - Other (Sep Statement iso MTC) filed

43 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/27/2022
  • DocketROA Entry: Civil Trial Assignment - Long Cause - Civil Trial Assignment scheduled for 06/14/2022 at 08:30:00 AM in Department 47 at Gordon D Schaber Courthouse was vacated

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/17/2022
  • DocketROA Entry: Civil Settlement Conference - Civil Settlement Conference scheduled for 05/23/2022 at 01:30:00 PM in Department 59 at Gordon D Schaber Courthouse was vacated

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/12/2022
  • DocketPast Hearings; Event Time: 9:00 AM; Event Type: Motion for Summary Judgment and/or Adjudication - Civil Law and Motion - MSA/MSJ/SLAPP; Department: 54; Status: Heard

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketROA Entry: Minutes finalized for Motion for Summary Judgment and/or Adjudication - Civil Law and Motion - MSA/MSJ/SLAPP heard on 05/12/2022 09:00:00 AM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketROA Entry: Reply (re MSJ and request for court scheduled status conference) filed; Filed By: Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company(Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketROA Entry: Notice of Stay of Proceedings filed; Filed By: Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company(Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketROA Entry: Opposition (to MSJ/SA) filed; Filed By: Golden State Broadcasting LLC(Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/12/2022
  • DocketROA Entry: Civil Settlement Conference - Civil Settlement Conference scheduled for 05/23/2022 at 01:30:00 PM in Department 59 at Gordon D Schaber Courthouse and the No Forms has been generated

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/12/2022
  • DocketROA Entry: Civil Settlement Conference - Civil Settlement Conference rescheduled to 05/23/2022 at 01:30:00 PM in Department 59 at Gordon D Schaber Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketROA Entry: Request - Other (to Cont. MSC) filed; Filed By: Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company(Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
70 More Docket Entries
  • 08/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketROA Entry: Declaration of Due Diligence filed; Filed By: Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company(Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketROA Entry: Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed; Filed By: Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company(Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketROA Entry: Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute filed; Filed By: Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company(Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketROA Entry: Affidavit - Other (Affidavit Of Reasonable Diligence) filed; Filed By: Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company(Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketROA Entry: Case Management Conference - Case Management Program scheduled for 01/16/2020 at 08:30:00 AM in Department 39 at Gordon D Schaber Courthouse and the Notice of Case Management Conference and Order to Appear has been generated

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/17/2019
  • DocketROA Entry: Summons for 30-Day Summons was issued during case initiation on 07/17/2019

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/15/2019
  • DocketROA Entry: Case assigned to Department 39

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketROA Entry: Civil Case Cover Sheet filed; Filed By: Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company(Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketROA Entry: Summons filed; Filed By: Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company(Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketROA Entry: Complaint filed; Filed By: Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company(Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less