This case was last updated from Sacramento County Superior Courts on 04/10/2020 at 17:35:52 (UTC).

Petition of Virk Balvinder Singh

Case Summary

On 11/14/2019 Petition of Virk Balvinder Singh was filed as an Other lawsuit. This case was filed in Sacramento County Superior Courts, Gordon D Schaber Sacramento County Courthouse located in Sacramento, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********8851

  • Filing Date:

    11/14/2019

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Sacramento County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Gordon D Schaber Sacramento County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Sacramento, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Singh, Virk Balvinder

 

Court Documents

Decree Changing Name filed.

Decree Changing Name filed.

Proof of Publication filed.

Proof of Publication filed. (Filed By: Singh, Virk(Petitioner))

Minutes finalized for Order to Show Cause - Petition for Change of Name - Civil Law and Motion heard on 01/03/2020 02:00:00 PM .

Minutes finalized for Order to Show Cause - Petition for Change of Name - Civil Law and Motion heard on 01/03/2020 02:00:00 PM .

Petition for Change of Name filed.

Petition for Change of Name filed. (Filed By: Singh, Virk(Petitioner))

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed.

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed. (Filed By: Singh, Virk(Petitioner))

Proposed Decree filed.

Proposed Decree filed. (Filed By: Singh, Virk(Petitioner))

Order on Court Fee Waiver (FW-003) filed.

Order on Court Fee Waiver (FW-003) filed. (Filed By: Singh, Virk(Petitioner))

Order to Show Cause re Change of Name filed.

Order to Show Cause re Change of Name filed.

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/03/2020
  • DocketPast Hearings - Event Time: 2:00 PM; Event Type: Order to Show Cause - Petition for Change of Name - Civil Law and Motion; Department: 53; Status: Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMinutes finalized for Order to Show Cause - Petition for Change of Name - Civil Law and Motion heard on 01/03/2020 02:00:00 PM .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDecree Changing Name filed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2020
  • DocketPetition for Change of Name has been Granted .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2020
  • DocketCase disposed with disposition of Granted .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Publication filed. (Filed By: Singh, Virk(Petitioner))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2019
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - Petition for Change of Name - Civil Law and Motion scheduled for 01/03/2020 at 02:00:00 PM in Department 53 at Gordon D Schaber Courthouse .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPetition for Change of Name filed. (Filed By: Singh, Virk(Petitioner))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed. (Filed By: Singh, Virk(Petitioner))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProposed Decree filed. (Filed By: Singh, Virk(Petitioner))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder on Court Fee Waiver (FW-003) filed. (Filed By: Singh, Virk(Petitioner))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2019
  • DocketCase assigned to Department 53 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2019
  • DocketSingh, Virk Balvinder Application for Waiver granted in full on 11/14/2019 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2019
  • DocketSingh, Virk Balvinder Application for Waiver granted in full on 11/14/2019.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause re Change of Name filed.

    Read MoreRead Less