This case was last updated from Sacramento County Superior Courts on 12/15/2019 at 13:30:45 (UTC).

Petition of Samantha Cruz

Case Summary

On 10/24/2019 Petition of Samantha Cruz was filed as an Other lawsuit. This case was filed in Sacramento County Superior Courts, Gordon D Schaber Sacramento County Courthouse located in Sacramento, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********7555

  • Filing Date:

    10/24/2019

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Courthouse:

    Gordon D Schaber Sacramento County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Sacramento, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Cruz, Samantha

Guardian Ad Litem

Valdez, Rafaela

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

Shanie N Bradley

 

Court Documents

Order Approving Compromise of Minors Claim filed.

Order Approving Compromise of Minors Claim filed. (Filed By: Cruz, Samantha(Petitioner))

Order to Deposit Money into Blocked Acct. filed.

Order to Deposit Money into Blocked Acct. filed. (Filed By: Cruz, Samantha(Petitioner))

Minutes finalized for Petition to Approve Compromise of Minors Claim - Minors Compromise heard on 11/06/2019 03:11:00 PM .

Minutes finalized for Petition to Approve Compromise of Minors Claim - Minors Compromise heard on 11/06/2019 03:11:00 PM .

Clerk's Certificate of Service By Mail (Minute Order) generated .

Clerk's Certificate of Service By Mail (Minute Order) generated .

Order Appointing Guardian Ad Litem filed.

Order Appointing Guardian Ad Litem filed.

Expedited Petition to Approve Compromise of Disputed Claim or Pending Action or Disposition of Proceeds of Judgment For Minor or Person With a Disability (Case Initiation) filed.

Expedited Petition to Approve Compromise of Disputed Claim or Pending Action or Disposition of Proceeds of Judgment For Minor or Person With a Disability (Case Initiation) filed. (Filed By: Cruz, Samantha(Petitioner))

Proposed Order Approving Compromise of Disputed Claim or Pending Action or Disposition of Proceeds of Judgment for Minor or Person With a Disability filed.

Proposed Order Approving Compromise of Disputed Claim or Pending Action or Disposition of Proceeds of Judgment for Minor or Person With a Disability filed. (Filed By: Cruz, Samantha(Petitioner))

Proposed Order to Deposit filed.

Proposed Order to Deposit filed. (Filed By: Cruz, Samantha(Petitioner))

Application and Proposed Order for Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem filed.

Application and Proposed Order for Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem filed. (Filed By: Cruz, Samantha(Petitioner))

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/06/2019
  • DocketPast Hearings - Event Time: 3:11 PM; Event Type: Petition to Approve Compromise of Minors Claim - Minors Compromise; Department: 22; Status: Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2019
  • DocketCase disposed with disposition of Granted .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2019
  • DocketExpedited Petition to Approve Compromise of Disputed Claim or Pending Action or Disposition of Proceeds of Judgment For Minor or Person With a Disability (Case Initiation) has been Granted .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder to Deposit Money into Blocked Acct. filed. (Filed By: Cruz, Samantha(Petitioner))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder Approving Compromise of Minors Claim filed. (Filed By: Cruz, Samantha(Petitioner))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketClerk's Certificate of Service By Mail (Minute Order) generated .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMinutes finalized for Petition to Approve Compromise of Minors Claim - Minors Compromise heard on 11/06/2019 03:11:00 PM .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder Appointing Guardian Ad Litem filed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketApplication and Proposed Order for Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem filed. (Filed By: Cruz, Samantha(Petitioner))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProposed Order to Deposit filed. (Filed By: Cruz, Samantha(Petitioner))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2019
  • DocketCase assigned to Department 22 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProposed Order Approving Compromise of Disputed Claim or Pending Action or Disposition of Proceeds of Judgment for Minor or Person With a Disability filed. (Filed By: Cruz, Samantha(Petitioner))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketExpedited Petition to Approve Compromise of Disputed Claim or Pending Action or Disposition of Proceeds of Judgment For Minor or Person With a Disability (Case Initiation) filed. (Filed By: Cruz, Samantha(Petitioner))

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Shanie N Bradley