Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Sacramento County Superior Courts on 03/06/2021 at 13:30:27 (UTC).

Petition of Matilde Lucrecia Mesia

Case Summary

On 01/13/2021 Petition of Matilde Lucrecia Mesia was filed as an Other lawsuit. This case was filed in Sacramento County Superior Courts, Gordon D Schaber Sacramento County Courthouse located in Sacramento, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********2355

  • Filing Date:

    01/13/2021

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Sacramento County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Gordon D Schaber Sacramento County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Sacramento, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Mesia, Matilde Lucrecia

 

Court Documents

Proof of Publication filed.

Proof of Publication filed. (Filed By: Mesia, Matilde(Petitioner))

Proof of Publication filed.

Proof of Publication filed. (Filed By: Mesia, Matilde(Petitioner))

Minutes finalized for Order to Show Cause - Petition for Change of Name - Civil Law and Motion heard on 03/04/2021 09:00:00 AM .

Minutes finalized for Order to Show Cause - Petition for Change of Name - Civil Law and Motion heard on 03/04/2021 09:00:00 AM .

Order to Show Cause re Change of Name filed.

Order to Show Cause re Change of Name filed.

Petition for Change of Name filed.

Petition for Change of Name filed. (Filed By: Mesia, Matilde(Petitioner))

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed.

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed. (Filed By: Mesia, Matilde(Petitioner))

Proposed Decree filed.

Proposed Decree filed. (Filed By: Mesia, Matilde(Petitioner))

Order on Court Fee Waiver (FW-003) filed.

Order on Court Fee Waiver (FW-003) filed. (Filed By: Mesia, Matilde(Petitioner))

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/04/2021
  • DocketPast Hearings - Event Time: 9:00 AM; Event Type: Order to Show Cause - Petition for Change of Name - Civil Law and Motion; Department: 54; Status: Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMinutes finalized for Order to Show Cause - Petition for Change of Name - Civil Law and Motion heard on 03/04/2021 09:00:00 AM .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2021
  • DocketDecree Changing Name filed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2021
  • DocketPetition for Change of Name has been Granted .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2021
  • DocketCase disposed with disposition of Granted .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Publication filed. (Filed By: Mesia, Matilde(Petitioner))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Publication filed. (Filed By: Mesia, Matilde(Petitioner))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - Petition for Change of Name - Civil Law and Motion scheduled for 03/04/2021 at 09:00:00 AM in Department 54 at Gordon D Schaber Courthouse .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder on Court Fee Waiver (FW-003) filed. (Filed By: Mesia, Matilde(Petitioner))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2021
  • DocketMesia, Matilde Lucrecia Application for Waiver granted in full on 01/14/2021 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPetition for Change of Name filed. (Filed By: Mesia, Matilde(Petitioner))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed. (Filed By: Mesia, Matilde(Petitioner))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProposed Decree filed. (Filed By: Mesia, Matilde(Petitioner))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2021
  • DocketCase assigned to Department 53 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause re Change of Name filed.

    Read MoreRead Less