Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Sacramento County Superior Courts on 03/06/2021 at 13:31:22 (UTC).

Petition of Katie Cyrus

Case Summary

On 01/13/2021 Petition of Katie Cyrus was filed as an Other lawsuit. This case was filed in Sacramento County Superior Courts, Gordon D Schaber Sacramento County Courthouse located in Sacramento, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********2386

  • Filing Date:

    01/13/2021

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Sacramento County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Gordon D Schaber Sacramento County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Sacramento, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Cyrus, Katie

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

Timothy S Spangler

 

Court Documents

Declaration - Other (of Tim Spangler Re: Correction of Errors) filed.

Declaration - Other (of Tim Spangler Re: Correction of Errors) filed. (Filed By: Cyrus, Katie(Petitioner))

Proposed Order Approving Compromise of Disputed Claim or Pending Action or Disposition of Proceeds of Judgment for Minor or Person With a Disability (Amended) filed.

Proposed Order Approving Compromise of Disputed Claim or Pending Action or Disposition of Proceeds of Judgment for Minor or Person With a Disability (Amended) filed. (Filed By: Cyrus, Katie(Petitioner))

Proposed Order to Deposit (Amended) filed.

Proposed Order to Deposit (Amended) filed. (Filed By: Cyrus, Katie(Petitioner))

Order Approving Compromise of Minors Claim filed.

Order Approving Compromise of Minors Claim filed.

Order to Deposit Money into Blocked Acct. filed.

Order to Deposit Money into Blocked Acct. filed.

Order - Other (ADDITIONAL ORDER #13) filed.

Order - Other (ADDITIONAL ORDER #13) filed.

Status Conference - Minors Compromise scheduled for 05/06/2021 at 09:00:00 AM in Department 42 at Gordon D Schaber Courthouse and the Notice of Hearing has been generated .

Status Conference - Minors Compromise scheduled for 05/06/2021 at 09:00:00 AM in Department 42 at Gordon D Schaber Courthouse and the Notice of Hearing has been generated .

Petition to Approve Compromise of Disputed Claim or Pending Action or Disposition of Proceeds of Judgment for Minor or Person With a Disability (Case Initiation) filed.

Petition to Approve Compromise of Disputed Claim or Pending Action or Disposition of Proceeds of Judgment for Minor or Person With a Disability (Case Initiation) filed. (Filed By: Cyrus, Katie(Petitioner))

Proposed Order Approving Compromise of Disputed Claim or Pending Action or Disposition of Proceeds of Judgment for Minor or Person With a Disability filed.

Proposed Order Approving Compromise of Disputed Claim or Pending Action or Disposition of Proceeds of Judgment for Minor or Person With a Disability filed. (Filed By: Cyrus, Katie(Petitioner))

Proposed Order to Deposit filed.

Proposed Order to Deposit filed. (Filed By: Cyrus, Katie(Petitioner))

Declaration - Other (of David Naraghi in Support of Petition) filed.

Declaration - Other (of David Naraghi in Support of Petition) filed. (Filed By: Cyrus, Katie(Petitioner))

Proof of Service filed.

Proof of Service filed. (Filed By: Cyrus, Katie(Petitioner))

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/06/2021
  • HearingEvent Type: Status Conference - Minors Compromise; Department: 42; Status: Scheduled

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus Conference - Minors Compromise scheduled for 05/06/2021 at 09:00:00 AM in Department 42 at Gordon D Schaber Courthouse and the Notice of Hearing has been generated .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder Approving Compromise of Minors Claim filed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder to Deposit Money into Blocked Acct. filed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder - Other (ADDITIONAL ORDER #13) filed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2021
  • DocketPetition to Approve Compromise of Disputed Claim or Pending Action or Disposition of Proceeds of Judgment for Minor or Person With a Disability (Case Initiation) has been Granted .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2021
  • DocketCase disposed with disposition of Granted .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDeclaration - Other (of Tim Spangler Re: Correction of Errors) filed. (Filed By: Cyrus, Katie(Petitioner))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProposed Order Approving Compromise of Disputed Claim or Pending Action or Disposition of Proceeds of Judgment for Minor or Person With a Disability (Amended) filed. (Filed By: Cyrus, Katie(Petitioner))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProposed Order to Deposit (Amended) filed. (Filed By: Cyrus, Katie(Petitioner))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPetition to Approve Compromise of Disputed Claim or Pending Action or Disposition of Proceeds of Judgment for Minor or Person With a Disability (Case Initiation) filed. (Filed By: Cyrus, Katie(Petitioner))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProposed Order Approving Compromise of Disputed Claim or Pending Action or Disposition of Proceeds of Judgment for Minor or Person With a Disability filed. (Filed By: Cyrus, Katie(Petitioner))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProposed Order to Deposit filed. (Filed By: Cyrus, Katie(Petitioner))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDeclaration - Other (of David Naraghi in Support of Petition) filed. (Filed By: Cyrus, Katie(Petitioner))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service filed. (Filed By: Cyrus, Katie(Petitioner))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2021
  • DocketCase assigned to Department 42 .

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Timothy S Spangler