This case was last updated from Sacramento County Superior Courts on 02/12/2021 at 01:39:51 (UTC).

People of the state of California, acting by and through the California Department of Tax and Fee Administration vs. Laxiu Tian

Case Summary

On 09/14/2020 People of the state of California, acting by and through the California Department of Tax and Fee Administration filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against Laxiu Tian. This case was filed in Sacramento County Superior Courts, Gordon D Schaber Sacramento County Courthouse located in Sacramento, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********5236

  • Filing Date:

    09/14/2020

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Sacramento, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

People of the state of California, acting by and through the California Department of Tax and Fee Administration

Defendants

Tian, Laxiu

Does 1-50

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Daniel W Robertson

 

Court Documents

Summons filed.

Summons filed. (Filed By: People of the state of California, acting by and through the California Department of Tax and Fee Administration(Plaintiff))

Order - Other (Delay in Scheduling Initial Case Management Conference) filed.

Order - Other (Delay in Scheduling Initial Case Management Conference) filed.

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed.

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed. (Filed By: People of the state of California, acting by and through the California Department of Tax and Fee Administration(Plaintiff))

Complaint filed.

Complaint filed. (Filed By: People of the state of California, acting by and through the California Department of Tax and Fee Administration(Plaintiff))

Amended Complaint (To Collect Delinquent Sales And Use Taxes) filed.

Amended Complaint (To Collect Delinquent Sales And Use Taxes) filed. (Filed By: People of the state of California, acting by and through the California Department of Tax and Fee Administration(Plaintiff))

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed.

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed. (Filed By: People of the state of California, acting by and through the California Department of Tax and Fee Administration(Plaintiff))

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/10/2020
  • DocketProof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed. (Filed By: People of the state of California, acting by and through the California Department of Tax and Fee Administration(Plaintiff))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed. (Filed By: People of the state of California, acting by and through the California Department of Tax and Fee Administration(Plaintiff))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAmended Complaint (To Collect Delinquent Sales And Use Taxes) filed. (Filed By: People of the state of California, acting by and through the California Department of Tax and Fee Administration(Plaintiff))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons filed. (Filed By: People of the state of California, acting by and through the California Department of Tax and Fee Administration(Plaintiff))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint filed. (Filed By: People of the state of California, acting by and through the California Department of Tax and Fee Administration(Plaintiff))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed. (Filed By: People of the state of California, acting by and through the California Department of Tax and Fee Administration(Plaintiff))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2020
  • DocketCase assigned to Department 31 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder - Other (Delay in Scheduling Initial Case Management Conference) filed.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Daniel William Robertson