This case was last updated from Sacramento County Superior Courts on 03/13/2021 at 13:34:17 (UTC).

Patrick Bankert vs. State of California Dept of Corrections & Rehabilitation

Case Summary

On 01/20/2021 Patrick Bankert filed an Other lawsuit against State of California Dept of Corrections Rehabilitation. This case was filed in Sacramento County Superior Courts, Gordon D Schaber Sacramento County Courthouse located in Sacramento, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********2764

  • Filing Date:

    01/20/2021

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Sacramento, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Bankert, Patrick

Respondent

State of California Dept of Corrections & Rehabilitation

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Respondent Attorney

Julio A Hernandez

 

Court Documents

Order - Other (Re: Delay In Scheduling Initital Case Management Conference) filed.

Order - Other (Re: Delay In Scheduling Initital Case Management Conference) filed.

Clerk's Certificate of Service By Mail (out of process) generated .

Clerk's Certificate of Service By Mail (out of process) generated .

Clerk's Certificate of Service By Mail (out of process) generated .

Clerk's Certificate of Service By Mail (out of process) generated .

Notice and Order of Complex Case Determination filed.

Notice and Order of Complex Case Determination filed.

Paper Exhibits filed.

Paper Exhibits filed. (Filed By: Bankert, Patrick(Petitioner))

Order on Court Fee Waiver (FW-003) filed.

Order on Court Fee Waiver (FW-003) filed. (Filed By: Bankert, Patrick(Petitioner))

Summons filed.

Summons filed. (Filed By: Bankert, Patrick(Petitioner))

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed.

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed. (Filed By: Bankert, Patrick(Petitioner))

Complaint filed.

Complaint filed. (Filed By: Bankert, Patrick(Petitioner))

Proof of Service filed.

Proof of Service filed. (Filed By: Bankert, Patrick(Petitioner))

Declaration - Other (of Demurring Party ISO Automatic Extension) filed.

Declaration - Other (of Demurring Party ISO Automatic Extension) filed. (Filed By: State of California Dept of Corrections & Rehabilitation(Respondent))

Proof of Personal Service - Petition filed.

Proof of Personal Service - Petition filed. (Filed By: Bankert, Patrick(Petitioner))

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/04/2021
  • DocketHernandez, Julio A added as a effective 03/03/2021 .

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDeclaration - Other (of Demurring Party ISO Automatic Extension) filed. (Filed By: State of California Dept of Corrections & Rehabilitation(Respondent))

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Personal Service - Petition filed. (Filed By: Bankert, Patrick(Petitioner))

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service filed. (Filed By: Bankert, Patrick(Petitioner))

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketClerk's Certificate of Service By Mail (out of process) generated .

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice and Order of Complex Case Determination filed.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketClerk's Certificate of Service By Mail (out of process) generated .

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder - Other (Re: Delay In Scheduling Initital Case Management Conference) filed.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons filed. (Filed By: Bankert, Patrick(Petitioner))

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder on Court Fee Waiver (FW-003) filed. (Filed By: Bankert, Patrick(Petitioner))

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/22/2021
  • DocketBankert, Patrick Application for Waiver granted in full on 01/22/2021 .

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/22/2021
  • DocketCase reassigned to 47 effective 01/20/2021 .

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPaper Exhibits filed. (Filed By: Bankert, Patrick(Petitioner))

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint filed. (Filed By: Bankert, Patrick(Petitioner))

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed. (Filed By: Bankert, Patrick(Petitioner))

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/20/2021
  • DocketCase assigned to Department 54 .

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less