This case was last updated from Sacramento County Superior Courts on 02/03/2023 at 13:34:13 (UTC).

Pacific Service Credit Union vs. Amanda J Bowman

Case Summary

On 12/13/2022 Pacific Service Credit Union filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Amanda J Bowman. This case was filed in Sacramento County Superior Courts, Gordon D Schaber Sacramento County Courthouse located in Sacramento, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********1699

  • Filing Date:

    12/13/2022

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Sacramento, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Pacific Service Credit Union

Defendants

Bowman, Amanda J.

California Department of Motor Vehicles

Does 1 through 20

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Barry A Smith

Defendant Attorney

Juan Cornejo

 

Court Documents

Complaint filed

Complaint filed

Statement of Venue filed

Statement of Venue filed

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed

Summons filed

Summons filed

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed

Stipulation and Proposed Order - Other (Stipulation, Acceptance of Service and Proposed Order RE Waiver of Appearance) filed

Stipulation and Proposed Order - Other (Stipulation, Acceptance of Service and Proposed Order RE Waiver of Appearance) filed

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/30/2023
  • DocketROA Entry: Cornejo, Juan added as a effective 01/26/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/26/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketROA Entry: Stipulation and Proposed Order - Other (Stipulation, Acceptance of Service and Proposed Order RE Waiver of Appearance) filed; Filed By: California Department of Motor Vehicles(Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/10/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketROA Entry: Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed; Filed By: Pacific Service Credit Union(Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketROA Entry: Summons filed; Filed By: Pacific Service Credit Union(Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketROA Entry: Civil Case Cover Sheet filed; Filed By: Pacific Service Credit Union(Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketROA Entry: Statement of Venue filed; Filed By: Pacific Service Credit Union(Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketROA Entry: Complaint filed; Filed By: Pacific Service Credit Union(Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less