This case was last updated from Sacramento County Superior Courts on 03/30/2022 at 21:55:44 (UTC).

Pacific Consolidated, Inc. vs. Garda World Security Corporation, a Canada corporation

Case Summary

On 06/30/2021 Pacific Consolidated, Inc filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Garda World Security Corporation, a Canada corporation. This case was filed in Sacramento County Superior Courts, Gordon D Schaber Sacramento County Courthouse located in Sacramento, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********3366

  • Filing Date:

    06/30/2021

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Sacramento, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Paccen, Inc., a Texas corporation

Pacific Consolidated of NV, Inc., a Nevada corporation

Pacific Consolidated, Inc.

Pacific Consolidated of CA, Inc. a Nevada corporation

Defendants

Does 1-50

Garda CL Atlantic, Inc., a Delaware corporation

Garda CL Northwest, Inc., a Washington corporation

Garda CL Southwest, Inc., a Texas corporation

Garda CL West, Inc.

Garda World Security Corporation, a Canada corporation

Gardaworld Cash Services, Inc. a Delaware corporation

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Matthew J Weber

Anthony S Chavez

Defendant Attorney

Alan J. Watson

 

Court Documents

Summons filed.

Summons filed. (Filed By: Paccen, Inc., a Texas corporation(Plaintiff); Pacific Consolidated of NV, Inc., a Nevada corporation(Plaintiff); Pacific Consolidated, Inc.(Plaintiff))

Order - Other (RE: Delay in Scheduling Initial Case Management Conference) filed.

Order - Other (RE: Delay in Scheduling Initial Case Management Conference) filed.

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed.

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed. (Filed By: Paccen, Inc., a Texas corporation(Plaintiff); Pacific Consolidated of NV, Inc., a Nevada corporation(Plaintiff); Pacific Consolidated, Inc.(Plaintiff))

Complaint filed.

Complaint filed. (Filed By: Paccen, Inc., a Texas corporation(Plaintiff); Pacific Consolidated of NV, Inc., a Nevada corporation(Plaintiff); Pacific Consolidated, Inc.(Plaintiff))

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed.

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed. (Filed By: Pacific Consolidated, Inc.(Plaintiff))

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed.

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed. (Filed By: Pacific Consolidated, Inc.(Plaintiff))

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed.

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed. (Filed By: Pacific Consolidated, Inc.(Plaintiff))

Amended Complaint (First) filed

Amended Complaint (First) filed

Summons (to First Amended Complaint) filed

Summons (to First Amended Complaint) filed

Motion to Quash Service of Summons submitted by Garda CL Atlantic, Inc., a Delaware corporation; Garda CL Northwest, Inc., a Washington corporation rejected on 02/17/2022

Motion to Quash Service of Summons submitted by Garda CL Atlantic, Inc., a Delaware corporation; Garda CL Northwest, Inc., a Washington corporation rejected on 02/17/2022

Order - Other (Scheduling of Case Management Conference) filed

Order - Other (Scheduling of Case Management Conference) filed

Clerk's Certificate of Service By Mail (out of process) generated

Clerk's Certificate of Service By Mail (out of process) generated

Demurrer (to Amended Complaint) filed

Demurrer (to Amended Complaint) filed

Notice - Other (of Demurrer to First Amended Complaint) filed

Notice - Other (of Demurrer to First Amended Complaint) filed

Motion to Quash Service of Summons filed

Motion to Quash Service of Summons filed

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/25/2022
  • HearingEvent Type: Hearing on Demurrer - Civil Law and Motion - Demurrer/JOP; Department: 54; Status: Scheduled

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2022
  • HearingEvent Type: Motion to Quash Service of Summons - Civil Law and Motion; Department: 54; Status: Scheduled

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2022
  • HearingEvent Type: Case Management Conference - Case Management Program; Department: 31; Status: Scheduled

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2022
  • DocketROA Entry: Motion to Quash Service of Summons - Civil Law and Motion scheduled for 05/25/2022 at 09:00:00 AM in Department 54 at Gordon D Schaber Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2022
  • DocketROA Entry: Hearing on Demurrer - Civil Law and Motion - Demurrer/JOP scheduled for 05/25/2022 at 09:00:00 AM in Department 54 at Gordon D Schaber Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2022
  • DocketROA Entry: Watson, Alan J. added as a effective 03/07/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketROA Entry: Motion to Quash Service of Summons filed; Filed By: Garda CL Atlantic, Inc., a Delaware corporation(Defendant); Garda CL Northwest, Inc., a Washington corporation(Defendant); Garda CL Southwest, Inc., a Texas corporation(Defendant); Garda World Security Corporation, a Canada corporation(Defendant); Gardaworld Cash Services, Inc. a Delaware corporation(Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketROA Entry: Notice - Other (of Demurrer to First Amended Complaint) filed; Filed By: Garda CL West, Inc.(Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketROA Entry: Demurrer (to Amended Complaint) filed; Filed By: Garda CL West, Inc.(Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketROA Entry: Clerk's Certificate of Service By Mail (out of process) generated

    Read MoreRead Less
6 More Docket Entries
  • 09/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketROA Entry: Amended Complaint (First) filed; Filed By: Paccen, Inc., a Texas corporation(Plaintiff); Pacific Consolidated of CA, Inc. a Nevada corporation(Plaintiff); Pacific Consolidated of NV, Inc., a Nevada corporation(Plaintiff); Pacific Consolidated, Inc.(Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketROA Entry: Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed; Filed By: Pacific Consolidated, Inc.(Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketROA Entry: Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed; Filed By: Pacific Consolidated, Inc.(Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketROA Entry: Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed; Filed By: Pacific Consolidated, Inc.(Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketROA Entry: Summons filed; Filed By: Paccen, Inc., a Texas corporation(Plaintiff); Pacific Consolidated of NV, Inc., a Nevada corporation(Plaintiff); Pacific Consolidated, Inc.(Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2021
  • DocketROA Entry: Summons for 30-Day Summons was issued during case initiation on 07/01/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2021
  • DocketROA Entry: Case assigned to Department 31

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketROA Entry: Order - Other (RE: Delay in Scheduling Initial Case Management Conference) filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketROA Entry: Civil Case Cover Sheet filed; Filed By: Paccen, Inc., a Texas corporation(Plaintiff); Pacific Consolidated of NV, Inc., a Nevada corporation(Plaintiff); Pacific Consolidated, Inc.(Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketROA Entry: Complaint filed; Filed By: Paccen, Inc., a Texas corporation(Plaintiff); Pacific Consolidated of NV, Inc., a Nevada corporation(Plaintiff); Pacific Consolidated, Inc.(Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Garda CL Atlantic, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where GARDAWORLD CASH SERVICES INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where GARDA WORLD A DELAWARE CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases where Garda CL Southwest, Inc. is a litigant