This case was last updated from Sacramento County Superior Courts on 02/09/2021 at 02:58:21 (UTC).

Omar e Solorio vs. A Teichert & Son Inc

Case Summary

On 06/23/2020 Omar e Solorio filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against A Teichert Son Inc. This case was filed in Sacramento County Superior Courts, Gordon D Schaber Sacramento County Courthouse located in Sacramento, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********1098

  • Filing Date:

    06/23/2020

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Sacramento, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Solorio, Omar e.

Defendants

California Materials Inc

Chester Bross Construction Company

State of California

Destination Anywhere Inc

Does 1-100

A Teichert & Son Inc

California Department of Transportation

Naryal Inc

Top Raman Trucking Inc

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Benjamin D Swanson

 

Court Documents

Tentative Ruling for Motion for Change of Venue - PJ Law and Motion set on 12/04/2020 09:30:00 AM published .

Tentative Ruling for Motion for Change of Venue - PJ Law and Motion set on 12/04/2020 09:30:00 AM published .

Tentative Ruling for Motion for Change of Venue - PJ Law and Motion set on 12/04/2020 09:30:00 AM published .

Tentative Ruling for Motion for Change of Venue - PJ Law and Motion set on 12/04/2020 09:30:00 AM published .

Order - Other (re: Initial CMC) filed.

Order - Other (re: Initial CMC) filed.

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed.

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed. (Filed By: Solorio, Omar(Plaintiff))

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed.

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed. (Filed By: Solorio, Omar(Plaintiff))

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed.

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed. (Filed By: Solorio, Omar(Plaintiff))

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute filed.

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute filed. (Filed By: Solorio, Omar(Plaintiff))

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute filed.

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute filed. (Filed By: Solorio, Omar(Plaintiff))

Ex Parte Application - Other (To Transfer Venue) submitted by Solorio, Omar e rejected on 10/13/2020 .

Ex Parte Application - Other (To Transfer Venue) submitted by Solorio, Omar e rejected on 10/13/2020 . (Filed By: Solorio, Omar(Plaintiff))

Motion for Change of Venue filed.

Motion for Change of Venue filed. (Filed By: Solorio, Omar(Plaintiff))

Minutes finalized for Motion for Change of Venue - PJ Law and Motion heard on 12/04/2020 09:30:00 AM .

Minutes finalized for Motion for Change of Venue - PJ Law and Motion heard on 12/04/2020 09:30:00 AM .

Order - Other (Order to Transfer Venue) filed.

Order - Other (Order to Transfer Venue) filed.

Case file contents transferred to receiving court Stanislaus pursuant to court order . .

Case file contents transferred to receiving court Stanislaus pursuant to court order . .

Notice of Transmittal of Papers and Pleadings - Change of Venue - Transfer out to Stanislaus County Superior Court

Notice of Transmittal of Papers and Pleadings - Change of Venue - Transfer out to Stanislaus County Superior Court

Complaint - Doe Amendment (Doe 1) filed.

Complaint - Doe Amendment (Doe 1) filed. (Filed By: Solorio, Omar(Plaintiff))

Complaint - Doe Amendment (Doe 2) filed.

Complaint - Doe Amendment (Doe 2) filed. (Filed By: Solorio, Omar(Plaintiff))

Complaint filed.

Complaint filed. (Filed By: Solorio, Omar(Plaintiff))

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed.

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed. (Filed By: Solorio, Omar(Plaintiff))

8 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase file contents transferred to receiving court Stanislaus pursuant to court order . .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Transmittal of Papers and Pleadings - Change of Venue - Transfer out to Stanislaus County Superior Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2021
  • DocketPast Hearings - Event Time: 8:30 AM; Event Type: Case Management Conference - Case Management Program; Department: 31; Status: Scheduled

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder - Other (Order to Transfer Venue) filed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2020
  • DocketPast Hearings - Event Time: 9:30 AM; Event Type: Motion for Change of Venue - PJ Law and Motion; Department: 47; Status: Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2020
  • DocketMatter ordered transferred to Stanislaus County.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMinutes finalized for Motion for Change of Venue - PJ Law and Motion heard on 12/04/2020 09:30:00 AM .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketTentative Ruling for Motion for Change of Venue - PJ Law and Motion set on 12/04/2020 09:30:00 AM published .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketTentative Ruling for Motion for Change of Venue - PJ Law and Motion set on 12/04/2020 09:30:00 AM published .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2020
  • DocketMotion for Change of Venue - PJ Law and Motion scheduled for 12/04/2020 at 09:30:00 AM in Department 47 at Gordon D Schaber Courthouse .

    Read MoreRead Less
8 More Docket Entries
  • 09/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder - Other (re: Initial CMC) filed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2020
  • DocketNaryal Inc added as a Defendant effective 07/14/2020 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2020
  • DocketTop Raman Trucking Inc added as a Defendant effective 07/14/2020 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint - Doe Amendment (Doe 1) filed. (Filed By: Solorio, Omar(Plaintiff))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint - Doe Amendment (Doe 2) filed. (Filed By: Solorio, Omar(Plaintiff))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Conference - Case Management Program scheduled for 01/07/2021 at 08:30:00 AM in Department 31 at Gordon D Schaber Courthouse and the Notice of Case Management Conference and Order to Appear has been generated .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons filed. (Filed By: Solorio, Omar(Plaintiff))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint filed. (Filed By: Solorio, Omar(Plaintiff))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed. (Filed By: Solorio, Omar(Plaintiff))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2020
  • DocketCase assigned to Department 31 .

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Chester Bross Construction Co. is a litigant

Latest cases where A. Teichert & Son, Inc., dba Teichert Construction is a litigant

Latest cases where CALIFORNIA DEPARTMENT OF TRANSPORTATION is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer SWANSON BENJAMIN D