This case was last updated from Sacramento County Superior Courts on 02/08/2021 at 16:26:48 (UTC).

Nicholas B Toy on behalf of himself and all others similarly situated vs. Myers & Sons Construction LLC

Case Summary

On 05/26/2020 Nicholas B Toy on behalf of himself and all others similarly situated filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against Myers Sons Construction LLC. This case was filed in Sacramento County Superior Courts, Gordon D Schaber Sacramento County Courthouse located in Sacramento, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********9448

  • Filing Date:

    05/26/2020

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • County, State:

    Sacramento, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Nicholas B Toy on behalf of himself and all others similarly situated

on behalf of all others similarly situated

Toy, Nicholas B.

Martinez, Edgar

Defendants

Does 1-50

Myers & Sons Construction LLC

Myers & Sons LP

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Joshua S Falakassa

Mehrdad Bokhour

Defendant Attorney

Shaye Harrington

 

Court Documents

Tentative Ruling for Case Management Conference - Complex set on 12/11/2020 10:30:00 AM published .

Tentative Ruling for Case Management Conference - Complex set on 12/11/2020 10:30:00 AM published .

Proof of Service of 30 day Summons & Complaint - Notice of Acknowledgment of Receipt filed.

Proof of Service of 30 day Summons & Complaint - Notice of Acknowledgment of Receipt filed. (Filed By: Toy, Nicholas(Plaintiff))

Amended Complaint filed.

Amended Complaint filed. (Filed By: Martinez, Edgar(Plaintiff); Toy, Nicholas(Plaintiff); on behalf of all others similarly situated(Plaintiff))

Proof of Service of 30 day Summons & Complaint - Notice of Acknowledgment of Receipt filed.

Proof of Service of 30 day Summons & Complaint - Notice of Acknowledgment of Receipt filed. (Filed By: Toy, Nicholas(Plaintiff))

Request - Other (for Dismissal of 2nd and 3rd Cause of Action Without Prejudice and Dismissal of Class Representative Edgar Martinez) filed.

Request - Other (for Dismissal of 2nd and 3rd Cause of Action Without Prejudice and Dismissal of Class Representative Edgar Martinez) filed. (Filed By: Toy, Nicholas(Plaintiff))

Declaration - Other (of Defts Re: Inability to Satisfy Meet & Confer Efforts) filed.

Declaration - Other (of Defts Re: Inability to Satisfy Meet & Confer Efforts) filed. (Filed By: Myers & Sons Construction LLC(Defendant); Myers & Sons LP(Defendant))

Ex Parte Application - Other (Dismissing Second and Third Cause of Action) submitted by Toy, Nicholas B rejected on 08/27/2020 .

Ex Parte Application - Other (Dismissing Second and Third Cause of Action) submitted by Toy, Nicholas B rejected on 08/27/2020 . (Filed By: Toy, Nicholas(Plaintiff))

Amended Complaint submitted by Toy, Nicholas B rejected on 08/31/2020 .

Amended Complaint submitted by Toy, Nicholas B rejected on 08/31/2020 . (Filed By: Toy, Nicholas(Plaintiff))

Motion for Leave to Amend (Complaint) filed.

Motion for Leave to Amend (Complaint) filed. (Filed By: Toy, Nicholas(Plaintiff))

Declaration - Other (of Mehrdad Bokhour ISO Motion for Leave to Amend) filed.

Declaration - Other (of Mehrdad Bokhour ISO Motion for Leave to Amend) filed. (Filed By: Toy, Nicholas(Plaintiff))

Declaration - Other (Dec of Shaye Schrick ISO of defendant's Myers and sons construction and myers and sons construction motion to strike to plaintiff's first amended complaint) filed.

Declaration - Other (Dec of Shaye Schrick ISO of defendant's Myers and sons construction and myers and sons construction motion to strike to plaintiff's first amended complaint) filed. (Filed By: Myers & Sons Construction LLC(Defendant); Myers & Sons LP(Defendant))

Memorandum of Points and Authorities (MPA ISO of defendant's motion to strike plaintiff's first amended complaint) filed.

Memorandum of Points and Authorities (MPA ISO of defendant's motion to strike plaintiff's first amended complaint) filed. (Filed By: Myers & Sons Construction LLC(Defendant); Myers & Sons LP(Defendant))

Motion to Strike (Moiton to strike first amended complaint) filed.

Motion to Strike (Moiton to strike first amended complaint) filed. (Filed By: Myers & Sons Construction LLC(Defendant); Myers & Sons LP(Defendant))

Proposed Order (Order granting defendant's motion to strike to plaintiff's first amended complaint) filed.

Proposed Order (Order granting defendant's motion to strike to plaintiff's first amended complaint) filed. (Filed By: Myers & Sons Construction LLC(Defendant); Myers & Sons LP(Defendant))

Request - Judicial Notice (Request for judical notice ISO of defendant's motion to strike plaintiff's first amended complaint) filed.

Request - Judicial Notice (Request for judical notice ISO of defendant's motion to strike plaintiff's first amended complaint) filed. (Filed By: Myers & Sons Construction LLC(Defendant); Myers & Sons LP(Defendant))

Demurrer (Defendant's notice of demurrer and demurrer to plaintiff's first amended complaint) filed.

Demurrer (Defendant's notice of demurrer and demurrer to plaintiff's first amended complaint) filed. (Filed By: Myers & Sons Construction LLC(Defendant); Myers & Sons LP(Defendant))

Declaration - Other (Declaration ISO defendant's demurrer to plaintiff's first amended complaint) filed.

Declaration - Other (Declaration ISO defendant's demurrer to plaintiff's first amended complaint) filed. (Filed By: Myers & Sons Construction LLC(Defendant); Myers & Sons LP(Defendant))

Memorandum of Points and Authorities (MP&A ISO of defendant's demurrer to plaintiff's first amended complaint) filed.

Memorandum of Points and Authorities (MP&A ISO of defendant's demurrer to plaintiff's first amended complaint) filed. (Filed By: Myers & Sons Construction LLC(Defendant); Myers & Sons LP(Defendant))

34 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/21/2021
  • HearingEvent Type: Case Management Conference - Complex; Department: 40; Status: Scheduled

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service filed. (Filed By: Toy, Nicholas(Plaintiff); on behalf of all others similarly situated(Plaintiff))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder - Other (Order Dismissing Plaintiff's Third and Fourth Cause of Action without Prejudice) filed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProposed Order (Proposed Order Dismissing Plaintiff's Third and Fourth Cause of Action Without Prejudice) filed. (Filed By: Toy, Nicholas(Plaintiff))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest - Other (Plaintiff's Request for Dismissal of Third and Fourth Cause of Action without Prejudice Pursuant to CRC 3.770(a)-(c), Declaration of Mehrdad Bokhour ISO Proposed Order) filed. (Filed By: Toy, Nicholas(Plaintiff))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2020
  • DocketPast Hearings - Event Time: 10:30 AM; Event Type: Case Management Conference - Complex; Department: 40; Status: Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMinutes finalized for Case Management Conference - Complex heard on 12/11/2020 10:30:00 AM .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2020
  • DocketCase Management Conference - Complex scheduled for 05/21/2021 at 11:00:00 AM in Department 40 at Gordon D Schaber Courthouse .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketTentative Ruling for Case Management Conference - Complex set on 12/11/2020 10:30:00 AM published .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Intent to Appear Telephonically filed. (Filed By: Myers & Sons LP(Defendant))

    Read MoreRead Less
42 More Docket Entries
  • 06/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder - Other (Notice of Case Management Conference and Complex Case Managment Procedures) filed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2020
  • DocketCase reassigned to 40 effective 06/15/2020 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketClerk's Certificate of Service By Mail (Minute Order) generated .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice and Order of Complex Case Determination filed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2020
  • Docketon behalf of all others similarly situated added as a Plaintiff effective 05/26/2020 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2020
  • DocketDesignated a complex action on 05/27/2020 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint filed. (Filed By: Toy, Nicholas(Plaintiff); on behalf of all others similarly situated(Plaintiff))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons filed. (Filed By: Toy, Nicholas(Plaintiff); on behalf of all others similarly situated(Plaintiff))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed. (Filed By: Toy, Nicholas(Plaintiff); on behalf of all others similarly situated(Plaintiff))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2020
  • DocketCase assigned to Department 47 .

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where MYERS & SONS ? GRIFFITH A JOINT VENTURE is a litigant

Latest cases where MYERS & SONS CONSTRUCTION LP is a litigant

Latest cases where on behalf of all others similarly situated is a litigant