This case was last updated from Sacramento County Superior Courts on 03/15/2022 at 02:36:55 (UTC).

Newmanshire Westphalia LLC, a Limited Liability Corporation vs. Theresa Westphal

Case Summary

On 03/11/2021 Newmanshire Westphalia LLC, a Limited Liability Corporation filed a Property - Other Property Fraud lawsuit against Theresa Westphal. This case was filed in Sacramento County Superior Courts, Gordon D Schaber Sacramento County Courthouse located in Sacramento, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********6298

  • Filing Date:

    03/11/2021

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Property Fraud

  • County, State:

    Sacramento, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Newman, Edward

Newmanshire Westphalia LLC, a Limited Liability Corporation

Defendants

Westphal, Theresa

Does 1-25

Westphal, Christopher

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Julie M Chopourian

Defendant Attorney

J Douglas Kirk

 

Court Documents

Tentative Ruling for Case Management Conference - Case Management Program set on 02/18/2022 08:30:00 AM published

Tentative Ruling for Case Management Conference - Case Management Program set on 02/18/2022 08:30:00 AM published

Minutes finalized for Case Management Conference - Case Management Program heard on 02/18/2022 08:30:00 AM

Minutes finalized for Case Management Conference - Case Management Program heard on 02/18/2022 08:30:00 AM

Case Management Statement filed

Case Management Statement filed

Clerk's Certificate of Service By Mail (Minute Order) generated

Clerk's Certificate of Service By Mail (Minute Order) generated

Minutes finalized for Motion to Compel - Other - Civil Law and Motion heard on 02/03/2022 07:57:00 AM

Minutes finalized for Motion to Compel - Other - Civil Law and Motion heard on 02/03/2022 07:57:00 AM

Minutes finalized for Motion to Compel - Other - Civil Law and Motion heard on 02/02/2022 09:00:00 AM

Minutes finalized for Motion to Compel - Other - Civil Law and Motion heard on 02/02/2022 09:00:00 AM

Notice of Jury Fee Deposit filed

Notice of Jury Fee Deposit filed

Case Management Statement filed

Case Management Statement filed

Reply to Opposition filed

Reply to Opposition filed

Declaration - Other (of Julie M Chopourian ISO Opposition to MTC) filed

Declaration - Other (of Julie M Chopourian ISO Opposition to MTC) filed

Statement - Other (Sep Statement In Opposition to MTC) filed

Statement - Other (Sep Statement In Opposition to MTC) filed

Opposition (to Motion to Compel) filed

Opposition (to Motion to Compel) filed

Clerk's Certificate of Service By Mail (Minute Order) generated

Clerk's Certificate of Service By Mail (Minute Order) generated

Minutes finalized for heard on 01/04/2022 09:00:00 AM

Minutes finalized for heard on 01/04/2022 09:00:00 AM

Declaration - Other (of J. Douglas Kirk iso Motion to Compel Further Responses to Special Interrogatories, Set 1) filed

Declaration - Other (of J. Douglas Kirk iso Motion to Compel Further Responses to Special Interrogatories, Set 1) filed

Statement - Other (Separate Statement iso Motion to Compel Further Responses to Special Interrogatories, Set 1) filed

Statement - Other (Separate Statement iso Motion to Compel Further Responses to Special Interrogatories, Set 1) filed

Motion to Compel Discovery (Further Responses to Special Interrogatories, Set 1) filed

Motion to Compel Discovery (Further Responses to Special Interrogatories, Set 1) filed

Default denied as to Westphal, Theresa; Westphal, Christopher on Complaint

Default denied as to Westphal, Theresa; Westphal, Christopher on Complaint

14 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/18/2022
  • DocketPast Hearings; Event Time: 8:30 AM; Event Type: Case Management Conference - Case Management Program; Department: 31; Status: Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketROA Entry: Minutes finalized for Case Management Conference - Case Management Program heard on 02/18/2022 08:30:00 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2022
  • DocketROA Entry: Case Referred to Trial Setting process for parties' selection of Trial date and Mandatory Settlement Conference date no later than 60 days after the effective date

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2022
  • DocketROA Entry: Case Referred to Trial Setting process for parties' selection of Trial date and Mandatory Settlement Conference date within 60 days of the referral date

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketROA Entry: Case Management Statement filed; Filed By: Westphal, Christopher(Defendant); Westphal, Theresa(Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2022
  • DocketPast Hearings; Event Time: 7:57 AM; Event Type: Motion to Compel - Other - Civil Law and Motion; Department: 54; Status: Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketROA Entry: Clerk's Certificate of Service By Mail (Minute Order) generated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketROA Entry: Minutes finalized for Motion to Compel - Other - Civil Law and Motion heard on 02/03/2022 07:57:00 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2022
  • DocketPast Hearings; Event Time: 9:00 AM; Event Type: Motion to Compel - Other - Civil Law and Motion; Department: 54; Status: Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketROA Entry: Minutes finalized for Motion to Compel - Other - Civil Law and Motion heard on 02/02/2022 09:00:00 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
16 More Docket Entries
  • 07/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketROA Entry: Default denied as to Westphal, Theresa; Westphal, Christopher on Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketROA Entry: Request - Entry of Default filed; Filed By: Newmanshire Westphalia LLC, a Limited Liability Corporation(Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketROA Entry: Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed; Filed By: Newmanshire Westphalia LLC, a Limited Liability Corporation(Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketROA Entry: Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed; Filed By: Newmanshire Westphalia LLC, a Limited Liability Corporation(Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2021
  • DocketROA Entry: Summons for 30-Day Summons was issued during case initiation on 03/15/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketROA Entry: Summons filed; Filed By: Newman, Edward(Plaintiff); Newmanshire Westphalia LLC, a Limited Liability Corporation(Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2021
  • DocketROA Entry: Case assigned to Department 31

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketROA Entry: Order - Other (Delay in Scheduling Initial Case Management Conference) filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketROA Entry: Civil Case Cover Sheet filed; Filed By: Newman, Edward(Plaintiff); Newmanshire Westphalia LLC, a Limited Liability Corporation(Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketROA Entry: Complaint filed; Filed By: Newman, Edward(Plaintiff); Newmanshire Westphalia LLC, a Limited Liability Corporation(Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer CHOPOURIAN, JULIE M